Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc., Midea America Corporation and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00615
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have filed a document they call a "stipulation for dismissal of party," in which they agree to dismiss Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Dkt. #14 . But plaintiff is still proceeding on claims against other defendants. When a plaintiff wishes to dismiss less than the entire action, the proper course is to file an amended pleading under Rule 15(a) rather than a stipulation of dismissal. See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F. 3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015). I construe the parties' stipulation as a motion for leave to amend the complaint, and so construed, the motion is GRANTED. Allianz Global is DISMISSED. Plaintiff need not file a new complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/8/2021. (rks)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party (Nester, Hillary)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Koch, R)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER by Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Midea America Corporation (Reid, John)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Katelyn E. Paider withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2021. (jls)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Koch, R)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/19/2021. (Reid, John)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Nester, Hillary)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Case Number 2:21-cv-1120. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Docket Sheet) (lak)
September 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
September 29, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Hillary Annin Nester
Represented By: Ronald W. Harmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn Evalise Paider
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: R Fletcher Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midea America Corporation
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: R Fletcher Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?