Sierra-Lopez, David v. Brook
Plaintiff: David E. Sierra-Lopez
Defendant: Correctional Officer Brook
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00624
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
November 12, 2021 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 2.69, receipt number 34690039755. (jef),(ps)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 2.69 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 11/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/25/2021. (aom),(ps)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2021: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff to submit a certifiable Trust Fund Account Statement by 10/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/05/2021. (aom),(ps)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez (aom),(ps)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David E. Sierra-Lopez. (aom),(ps)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by David E. Sierra-Lopez. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra-Lopez, David v. Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Sierra-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Brook
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?