The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Superior Refining Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Superior Refining Company LLC, Houston Services Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00655
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (rks)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Watson, David)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court has reviewed plaintiff The Charter Oak Fire Company's amended complaint (dkt. #10 ) and requires one additional piece of information to ensure that jurisdiction is proper. Charter Oak is required to plead the citizenship of an LLC's members. Camico Mut. Ins. Co. v. Citizens Bank, 474 F.3d 989, 992 (7th Cir. 2007). Given that Charter Oak alleges that Husky Superior Refining Holding Corp. is the sole member of Superior Refining Company, LLC, (dkt. #10 ) Charter Oak must plead Husky's citizenship. As previously noted, "a corporation shall be deemed to be a citizen of every State and foreign state by which it has been incorporated and of the State or foreign state where is has its principal place of business." 1332(c)(1). Charter Oak has only provided Husky's state of incorporation and must additionally plead Husky's principal place of business in order to properly establish jurisdiction. Plaintiff The Charter Oak Fire Company has until November 23, 2021, to amend its complaint. Failure to respond to this order will result in the court dismissing this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff is also advised to exercise more care in its filings with the court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/16/2021. (rks)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Houston Services Inc., Mid-Continent Casualty Company, Superior Refining Company LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company, filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Watson, David)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick J. Strampe for Defendants Houston Services Inc., Mid-Continent Casualty Company. (Strampe, Frederick)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Superior Refining Company LLC answer due 1/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/9/2021. (rks)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Superior Refining Company LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Seese, Lee)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Lee M. Seese for Defendant Superior Refining Company LLC. (Seese, Lee)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Amended Notice of Removal due 11/17/2021. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/3/2021. (rks)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Watson, David)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Houston Services Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Mid-Continent Casualty Company, Superior Refining Company LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued) (rks)
October 18, 2021 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks/arw)
October 18, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Signed Complaint filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Watson, David)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 Unsigned COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2950835.), filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Watson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Superior Refining Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David Gordon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Refining Company LLC
Represented By: Lee M. Seese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Services Inc.
Represented By: Frederick J. Strampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Continent Casualty Company
Represented By: Frederick J. Strampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?