Spectrum Brands Pet LLC v. Chan, Kenny et al
Plaintiff: Spectrum Brands Pet LLC
Defendant: Kenny Chan, Wenjun Mao, Wendy Chiang, Xiuping He and John Does
Case Number: 3:2021cv00689
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendants Kenny Chan, Wendy Chiang, Xiuping He, Wenjun Mao. (kwf)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 Affidavit of Michelle M. (Umberger) Kemp filed by Plaintiff Spectrum Brands Pet LLC re: #11 Motion for Entry of Default. (Kemp, Michelle) Modified on 12/13/2021. (lak)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for Entry of Default as to Kenny Chan, Wendy Chiang, Xiuping He, Wenjun Mao. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kemp, Michelle) Modified on 12/13/2021. (lak)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wendy Chiang served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Kemp, Michelle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Xiuping He served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Kemp, Michelle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wenjun Mao served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Kemp, Michelle)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Kenny Chan served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Kemp, Michelle)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kenny Chan, Wendy Chiang, Xiuping He, Wenjun Mao. (kwf)
November 3, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
November 3, 2021 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related cases 21-cv-473-jdp, 21-cv-513-jdp. (kwf)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Gabrielle E. Bina for Plaintiff Spectrum Brands Pet LLC. (Bina, Gabrielle)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Spectrum Brands Pet LLC. (Hanewicz, Christopher)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Spectrum Brands Pet LLC. (Kemp, Michelle)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Kenny Chan, Wendy Chiang, John Does, Xiuping He, Wenjun Mao (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2958894.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 2,965,342, issued 7/5/2005, held by Spectrum Brands; Trademark # 3,238,141, issued 5/1/2007, held by Spectrum Brands; Trademark # 3,544,400, issued 12/9/2008, held by Spectrum Brands; Trademark # 5,722,436, issued 4/9/2019, held by Spectrum Brands, filed by Spectrum Brands Pet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2,965,342, #2 Exhibit B - 3,238,141, #3 Exhibit C - 3,544,400, #4 Exhibit D - 5,722,436, #5 Exhibit E - VA 1-935-204, #6 Exhibit F - VA 1-935-208, #7 Exhibit G - VA 1-935-198, #8 Exhibit H - VA 1-935-209, #9 Exhibit I - VA 1-935-202, #10 Exhibit J - VA 1-935-201, #11 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons to Kenny Chan, #13 Summons to Wendy Chiang, #14 Summons to Wenjun Mao, #15 Summons to Xiuping He, #16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Kemp, Michelle) Modified on 11/2/2021: Changed county from Dane to Out of State. Exhibits. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Brands Pet LLC v. Chan, Kenny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Brands Pet LLC
Represented By: Christopher G. Hanewicz
Represented By: Gabrielle E. Bina
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenjun Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Chiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiuping He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?