Hastings Mutual Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00713
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 2/14/2022. Dispositive Motions due 10/31/2022. Settlement Letters due 3/24/2023. Motions in Limine due 3/31/2023. Response to Motion due 4/21/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/15/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/5/2022. (jls)
January 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/4/2022 [:10] (cak)
December 30, 2021 Filing 12 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 Brief in Reply by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss (Heitkamp, Margaret)
December 9, 2021 Filing 10 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Hastings Mutual Insurance Company re: #4 Motion to Dismiss filed by Omega Flex, Inc. (Mundt, Rick)
December 3, 2021 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony Anzelmo for Defendant Omega Flex, Inc.. (Anzelmo, Anthony)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Hastings Mutual Insurance Company. (Mundt, Rick)
November 19, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
November 19, 2021 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 12/3/2021. (lak)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration of Arthur Weirauch filed by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photographs for TracPipe(R) CSST - date code 0438) (Heitkamp, Margaret)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of Margaret K. Heitkamp filed by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Property's Assessment Summary from 2005-2006, #2 Exhibit B - Property's Assessment Summary from April 12, 2006) (Heitkamp, Margaret)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Brief in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 12/9/2021. Brief in Reply due 12/20/2021. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Rick J. Mundt for Plaintiff Hastings Mutual Insurance Company. (Mundt, Rick)
November 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
November 12, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc.. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Buffalo County Circuit Court, case number 21-CV-61. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2963664), filed by Omega Flex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Buffalo County Circuit Court Record - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Buffalo County Circuit Court - Notice of Filing Removal of Civil Action) (Heitkamp, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hastings Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Julie E Piper-Kitchin
Represented By: Rick J. Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Kathryn Heitkamp
Represented By: Anthony Anzelmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?