Track, Inc. v. Swenson Spreader, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Track, Inc.
Defendant: ASH North America, Inc. and Swenson Spreader, LLC doing business as Swenson Products/AEBI Schmidt North America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00786
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Track, Inc. re: #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporation/LLC Search/Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - E-mail dated March 22, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Memo dated January 23, 2018, #4 Exhibit D - Memo dated February 13, 2018, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail dated August 20, 2018, #6 Exhibit F - Article dated July 7, 2021, #7 Exhibit G - Screen Shot) (Smies, Jonathan) Modified on 1/28/2022: Added exhibit descriptions. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 7/11/2022. Dispositive Motions due 3/31/2023. Settlement Letters due 7/21/2023. Motions in Limine due 7/28/2023. Response to Motion due 8/11/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2023 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/26/2022. (rks)
January 25, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/25/2022 [:10] (skv)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Smies, Jonathan)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, extensions granted. Brief in Opposition due 1/28/2022. Brief in Reply due 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/7/2022. (rks)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 Stipulation for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Track, Inc.. (Smies, Jonathan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Track, Inc.. (Smies, Jonathan)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan T. Smies for Plaintiff Track, Inc.. (Smies, Jonathan)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Gregory Francis Hauser Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/21/2021. (lak)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Thomas Phillips for Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC. (Phillips, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Steffen Schewerda filed by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC re: #6 Motion to Dismiss (Thome, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 Brief in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Authorities) (Thome, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 1/10/2022. Brief in Reply due 1/20/2022. (Thome, Matthew)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Gregory Francis Hauser Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2981910.) by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Hauser, Gregory)
December 13, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
December 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC as to #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Thome, Matthew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants ASH North America, Inc., Swenson Spreader, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Thome, Matthew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Defendants. (Thome, Matthew) Modified on 12/10/2021. (lak)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Oneida County, case number 2021CV000169. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2977681), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Adverse Party Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Certificate of Service) (Thome, Matthew) Modified on 12/10/2021: Corrected d/b/a, etc. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Track, Inc. v. Swenson Spreader, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Track, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan T. Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASH North America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Thome
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swenson Spreader, LLC doing business as Swenson Products/AEBI Schmidt North America
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Thome
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hauser
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?