United States of America v. Zvolanek, Patricia
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Patricia Zvolanek
Case Number: 3:2021cv00791
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Patricia Zvolanek. Patricia Zvolanek waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (Oswald, Barbara)
December 16, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors. (rks)
December 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Zvolanek., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 12.22.2010 Note, #3 Exhibit B - 01.18.2011 Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - 09.11.2012 Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - 09.17.2012 Assignment of Mortgage, #6 Exhibit E - 10.21.2016 Corrective Assignment of Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F - 05.19.2017 Assignment of Mortgage, #8 Exhibit G - 12.22.2010 Second Note, #9 Exhibit H - 01.18.2011 Second Mortgage, #10 Exhibit I - Notice of Intent to Foreclosure and Acceleration, #11 Exhibit J - Statement of Account) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zvolanek, Patricia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Zvolanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?