Shabani, Khaled v. Biden, Joe
Plaintiff: Khaled Shabani
Defendant: Joe Biden
Case Number: 3:2021cv00807
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is currently reviewing this case for potential jurisdictional issues. The clerk of court is directed not to issue summons until this court enters an order confirming that subject matter jurisdiction exists. If summons are issued, plaintiff's deadline for service will be extended accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/29/2021. (kmd),(ps)
December 29, 2021 Jurisdictional Screening. (jef),(ps)
December 29, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 34690039955. (kmd),(ps)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On November 4, 2020, the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals entered an order revoking plaintiff Khaled Shabani's entitlement to proceed in forma pauperis, ordering that in all his future civil suits he must prepay the filing fees in full. Shabani v. City of Madison, et al., App. No. 20-1452 (7th Cir. Nov. 4, 2020). Accordingly, this court's previous order granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this lawsuit is REVOKED. Plaintiff has until January 14, 2022, in which to pay the $402 filing fee in full. If he fails to pay the filing fee in full on or before that date, his case will be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/23/2021. (aom),(ps) Modified on 12/27/2021 (lam).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/22/2021. (aom),(ps)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Khaled Shabani. (aom),(ps)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Khaled Shabani. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shabani, Khaled v. Biden, Joe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaled Shabani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?