Lilley, Jeffrey v. Matthews, John et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lilley
Defendant: Wood County, John Matthews, Derek Phillippi and Kalvin Dorshorst
Case Number: 3:2022cv00008
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Kinne, Paul)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
January 27, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
January 27, 2022 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 2/22/2022. (lak)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr for Defendants Kalvin Dorshorst, John Matthews, Derek Phillippi, Wood County. (Hall, Samuel)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy M. Johnson for Defendants Kalvin Dorshorst, John Matthews, Derek Phillippi, Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Kalvin Dorshorst, John Matthews, Derek Phillippi, Wood County. (Johnson, Timothy)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kalvin Dorshorst, John Matthews, Derek Phillippi, Wood County. (kwf)
January 5, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
January 5, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2987645.), filed by Jeffrey Lilley. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Deputy J. Matthews, #3 Summons Deputy D. Phillippi, #4 Summons Lieutenant K. Dorshorst, #5 Summons Wood County) (Kinne, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilley, Jeffrey v. Matthews, John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lilley
Represented By: Paul A. Kinne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood County
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Matthews
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Phillippi
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalvin Dorshorst
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?