Glaser, Anthony v. Superior Silica Sands, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Glaser
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Superior Silica Sands, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company and Fred Weber, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00100
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (kwf)
April 21, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint (Wallo, William)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #20 Motion to Admit Robert J. Golterman Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Admit Oliver H. Thomas Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/20/2022. (lak)
April 19, 2022 Filing 21 Motion to Admit Oliver H Thomas Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-3039616.) by Third Party Defendants Fred Weber, Inc., Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Thomas, Oliver)
April 19, 2022 Filing 20 Motion to Admit Robert J Golterman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-3039601.) by Defendant Superior Silica Sands, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Golterman, Robert)
April 13, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 Brief in Support of #18 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Third-Party Complaint by Third Party Defendants Fred Weber, Inc., Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - First Amended Complaint with Exhibits) (Lovern, Susan) Modified on 4/13/2022. (lak)
April 12, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS , or in the Alternative, Stay Third-Party Complaint by Third Party Defendants Fred Weber, Inc., Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company. Brief in Opposition due 5/3/2022. Brief in Reply due 5/13/2022. (Lovern, Susan)
April 4, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by William E. Wallo re: Plaintiff Anthony Glaser re withdrawal of David Czech (Wallo, William)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #15 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/4/2022. (kwf)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Anthony Glaser. (Wallo, William)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by William E. Wallo for Plaintiff Anthony Glaser. (Wallo, William)
April 4, 2022 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to (8 in 3:22-cv-00099-jdp, 8 in 3:22-cv-00100-jdp) MOTION TO TRANSFER to Delaware Bankruptcy Court. Brief in Opposition due 4/18/2022. Brief in Reply due 4/28/2022. (kwf)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Derek John Waterstreet for Third Party Defendants Fred Weber, Inc., Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company. (Waterstreet, Derek)
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Third Party Defendant Fred Weber, Inc.. (Lovern, Susan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Third Party Defendant Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company. (Lovern, Susan)
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Susan E Lovern for Third Party Defendants Fred Weber, Inc., Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company. (Lovern, Susan)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 Declaration of Scott Waughtal filed by Defendant Superior Silica Sands, LLC re: #8 Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Findings of Fact Filed in Bankruptcy Court, #2 Exhibit B - Contract Schedule, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Filed in Bankruptcy Court, #4 Exhibit D - First Amended Complaint Filed in Bankruptcy Court, #5 Exhibit E - Memorandum Order Filed in Bankruptcy Court) (Zohn, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/14/2022. (lak)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Delaware Bankruptcy Court by Defendant Superior Silica Sands, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 4/4/2022. Brief in Reply due 4/14/2022. (Zohn, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Fred Weber, Inc. served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Zohn, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Zohn, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company and Fred Weber, Inc. (lak)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company, Fred Weber, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company), #2 Summons (Fred Weber, Inc.)) (Zohn, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related case 22-cv-99-jdp. (kwf)
February 25, 2022 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Ryan Zohn for Defendant Superior Silica Sands, LLC. (Zohn, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by David M. Friebus for Defendant Superior Silica Sands, LLC. (Friebus, David)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Chippewa County, case number 2022cv000013. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3013435), filed by Superior Silica Sands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court file, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Friebus, David) Modified on 2/25/2022: Corrected stats. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaser, Anthony v. Superior Silica Sands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Glaser
Represented By: David P. Czech
Represented By: William E. Wallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Superior Silica Sands, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Zohn
Represented By: David M. Friebus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Iron Mountain Trap Rock Company
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Oliver H Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fred Weber, Inc.
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Oliver H Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?