Fair et al v. Travel Centers of America, LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Fair and Donna K. Fair
Defendant: Travel Centers of America, LLC doing business as Travel Centers of America, Inc. also known as TA Operating, LLC doing business as Petro Stopping Centers and TA Operating, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00101
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Federal Court Action to Proceed in State Court as Filed (Scholl, Amy)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Constantine John Themelis withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/15/2022. (voc)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Constantine J. Themelis by Defendant Travel Centers of America, LLC. (Scholl, Amy)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Travel Centers of America, LLC. (Scholl, Amy)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Disregard. Modified on 3/16/2022. (lak)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Michelle Tyms (Scholl, Amy)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Technical Failure (Scholl, Amy)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Travel Centers of America, LLC. (Scholl, Amy)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy F. Scholl for Defendant Travel Centers of America, LLC. (Scholl, Amy)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-02090. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #24 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin.. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/25/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/25/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Travel Centers of America, LLC.(Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiffs Proposed Order)(Justice, Randall) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #23 Defendant's notice and setting the briefing schedule for #24 Defendant's Motion to Transfer. Plaintiffs' Response is due on February 1, 2022, and Defendant's Reply is due on February 15, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/19/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/19/2022 (kns, Deputy Clerk). [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case by Travel Centers of America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Travel Centers of America, LLC Regarding Pending Motion to Dismiss (Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER Directing Defendant to submit a filing on the docket within 14 days that either agrees its motion to dismiss for failure to effect service (ECF No. 17) is now moot in light of service being effected, or, alternatively, why the case should nonetheless be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/4/2022. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service, or in the Alternative, Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair.(Justice, Randall) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Private Process Server by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair(Justice, Randall) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Private Process Server by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair(Justice, Randall) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Private Process Server by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair(Justice, Randall) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service, or in the Alternative, Motion for Order to Show Cause by Travel Centers of America, LLC(Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER Directing Defendant to file a motion, waiver of service pursuant to FRCP 4, or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs complaint, or otherwise explain why such filing is improper within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/29/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/1/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 10 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Travel Centers of America, LLC must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Travel Centers of America, LLC Statement Concerning Removal (Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Travel Centers of America, LLC (Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/17/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/17/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Travel Centers of America, LLC or counsel for Travel Centers of America, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/31/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair or counsel for Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/31/2021. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Travel Centers of America, LLC. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Travel Centers of America, LLC, filed by Thomas E Fair, Donna K Fair.(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Jury Trial Demand by Donna K Fair, Thomas E Fair(bas, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Baltimore City, case number 24-C-21-3437. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9440969), filed by Travel Centers of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal Circuit Court)(Themelis, Constantine) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (jb5, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 2/25/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair et al v. Travel Centers of America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel Centers of America, LLC doing business as Travel Centers of America, Inc. also known as TA Operating, LLC doing business as Petro Stopping Centers
Represented By: Constantine John Themelis
Represented By: Amy F. Scholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating, LLC
Represented By: Constantine John Themelis
Represented By: Amy F. Scholl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Fair
Represented By: Randall M Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna K. Fair
Represented By: Randall M Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?