Ilelaboye, Olaoluwa v. Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Olaoluwa O. Ilelaboye
Defendant: Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00108
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 15 Declaration of Olaloluwa O. Ilelaboye filed by Plaintiff Olaoluwa O. Ilelaboye In Support of Motion to Allow Discovery re: #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 13, 2021 Physician Letter, #2 Exhibit B - June 18, 2021 Appeal Letter to Humana, #3 Exhibit C - June 29, 2021 Humana Letter, #4 Exhibit D - July 15, 2021 Humana Claim Denial Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Aug. 31, 2021 Letter to Humana, #6 Exhibit F- Oct. 11, 2021 Humana Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Oct. 11, 2021 Humana Letter Closing File) (Turke, Mary)
April 29, 2022 Filing 14 Motion to Allow Limited Discovery by Plaintiff Olaoluwa O. Ilelaboye. Response due 5/6/2022. (Turke, Mary)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Discovery due 4/29/2022. Dispositive Motions due 1/27/2023. Settlement Letters due 5/19/2023. Motions in Limine due 5/26/2023. Responses due 6/9/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/21/2023 at 4:00 PM. Court Trial set for 6/26/2023 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/13/2022. (kwf)
April 12, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/12/2022 [:10] (cak)
April 7, 2022 Filing 12 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation (Buliox, Warren)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation. (Buliox, Warren)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint within the deadline permitted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). So defendant's motions to dismiss, Dkt. #5 , is DENIED as moot. If defendant believes that the amended complaint is deficient, it will have to file a renewed motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/22/2022. (kwf)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation, filed by Olaoluwa O. Ilelaboye. (Turke, Mary)
March 10, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 Declaration of Susannah Meyer filed by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Coverage and Benefit Plan Document) (Buliox, Warren)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 Declaration of Warren E. Buliox filed by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, Electronic Filing Notice, Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Decision) (Buliox, Warren) Modified on 3/9/2022. (lak)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 Brief in Support of #5 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation (Buliox, Warren)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 3/29/2022. Brief in Reply due 4/8/2022. (Buliox, Warren)
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation. (Buliox, Warren)
March 2, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
March 2, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 Exhibits to #1 Notice of Removal. Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Coverage) (lak)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Warren E. Buliox for Defendant Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation. (Buliox, Warren)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Wisconsin Circuit Court Dane County, case number 22-CV-000044. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3015705), filed by Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Disregard, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Buliox, Warren) Modified on 3/1/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilelaboye, Olaoluwa v. Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olaoluwa O. Ilelaboye
Represented By: Mary Carolyn Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Warren E. Buliox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?