Beehner, Jadon v. Rhodes-Conway, Satya et al
Plaintiff: Jadon Beehner and Jadon R. Beehner
Defendant: Satya Rhodes-Conway, DBA Satya Rhodes-Conway, Steven A. Davis, DBA Steven A. Davis, Jerome Buechner, DBA Jerome Buechner, Paul Ripp, DBA Paul Ripp, Scott Bavery, DBA Scott Bavery, Tracy Buruss, DBA Tracy Buruss, Che Stedman and DBA Che Stedman
Case Number: 3:2022cv00183
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction -- Insufficient Service of Process, #14 MOTION TO DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for a More Definite Statement. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 6/14/2022. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 6/24/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 23, 2022 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven C. Zach for Defendant Steven A. Davis. (Zach, Steven),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 23 Affidavit of Tracy Burrus filed by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman re: #17 Motion to Dismiss (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 22 Affidavit of Scott Bavery filed by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman re: #17 Motion to Dismiss (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 21 Affidavit of Paul Ripp filed by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman re: #17 Motion to Dismiss (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 20 Affidavit of Jerome Buechner filed by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman re: #17 Motion to Dismiss (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 19 Affidavit of Che Stedman filed by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman re: #17 Motion to Dismiss (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 18 Brief in Support of #17 Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction -- Insufficient Service of Process by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman. (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 16 Brief in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 15 Disregard; refiled at dkt. #16 . (jef).
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Steven A. Davis, Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman. (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Storm Larson for Defendant Steven A. Davis. (Larson, Storm),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Che Stedman served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Tracy Buruss served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Scott Bavery served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Paul Ripp served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Jerome Buechner served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Steven A. Davis served on 5/2/2022, answer due 5/23/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Satya Rhodes-Conway served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Dane County Civil Process, LLC invoice) (jef),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven C. Zach for Defendants Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman. (Zach, Steven),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn A Harrell for Defendants Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman. (Harrell, Kathryn),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Storm Larson for Defendants Satya Rhodes-Conway, Che Stedman. (Larson, Storm),(ps)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Satya Rhodes-Conway, et al. Forwarded to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Steven Davis, #2 Summons as to Jerome Buechner, #3 Summons as to Paul Ripp, #4 Summons as to Scott Bavery, #5 Summons as to Tracy Buruss, #6 Summons as to Che Stedman, #7 Wis. Stats. 801.10) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2022: #8 Clerk's office cover letter) (jef).
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 34690040391.), filed by Jadon Beehner. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beehner, Jadon v. Rhodes-Conway, Satya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadon Beehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadon R. Beehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satya Rhodes-Conway
Represented By: Kathryn A Harrell
Represented By: Steven C. Zach
Represented By: Storm Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Satya Rhodes-Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Davis
Represented By: Steven C. Zach
Represented By: Storm Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Steven A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Buechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Jerome Buechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Paul Ripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Scott Bavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Buruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Tracy Buruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Che Stedman
Represented By: Kathryn A Harrell
Represented By: Steven C. Zach
Represented By: Storm Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBA Che Stedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?