Verso Corporation v. United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94
Plaintiff: Verso Corporation
Defendant: United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94
Case Number: 3:2022cv00194
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0185 Labor Management Relations Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Verso Corporation by United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - WARN letter, #3 Exhibit C - MOA, #4 Exhibit D - Grievance, #5 Exhibit E - Information Request, #6 Exhibit F - Transcript, #7 Exhibit G - Award) (Perillo, Frederick) Modified on 5/23/2022. (lak)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Antonia O. Domingo Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/5/2022. (lak)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Antonia O. Domingo Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3049993.) by Defendant United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Domingo, Antonia)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94. All Defendants. (Schreiner, David)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Perillo for Defendant United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94. (Perillo, Frederick)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Verso Corporation. (Schreiner, David)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94. (lak)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3033366.), filed by Verso Corporation. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Joint Labor Agreement, #4 Exhibit B - WARN Letter, #5 Exhibit C - Effects Bargaining Agreement, #6 Exhibit D - Union's Grievance, #7 Exhibit E - Arbitrator's Award) (Schreiner, David) Modified on 4/7/2022: Deleted addresses and duplicate plaintiff. (lak)
April 7, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 7, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verso Corporation v. United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verso Corporation
Represented By: David Earl Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers of America, Local Union No. 2-94
Represented By: Antonia O. Domingo
Represented By: Frederick Perillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?