Kaltenberg, Richard et al v. County of Dane
Plaintiff: Richard John Kaltenberg, Mary Beth Kaltenberg and Ziegler Dairy Farms, Inc.
Defendant: County of Dane
Case Number: 3:2022cv00198
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 7/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due 3/20/2023. Settlement Letters due 6/30/2023. Motions in Limine due 7/14/2023. Responses due 7/28/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2023 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/21/2023 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2022. (kwf)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At the May 17, 2022 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, the parties jointly persuaded the court to go with their proposal of deciding their inverse condemnation dispute before requiring the parties to begin the appraisal process. Therefore, the preliminary pretrial conference order sets dates only for phase one. If a taking is found, then a new schedule will be set for phase two. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/17/2022. (kwf)
May 17, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/17/2022 [:20] (skv)
May 10, 2022 Filing 7 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiffs Mary Beth Kaltenberg, Richard John Kaltenberg, Ziegler Dairy Farms, Inc. (Kassner, John)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Mary Beth Kaltenberg, Richard John Kaltenberg, Ziegler Dairy Farms, Inc.. (Kassner, John)
April 13, 2022 Filing 5 Demand for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Mary Beth Kaltenberg, Richard John Kaltenberg, Ziegler Dairy Farms, Inc. (Kassner, John)
April 11, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (lak)
April 11, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Defendant County of Dane as to #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Affidavit, #1 Notice of Removal. (Bitar, Remzy) Modified on 4/8/2022. (lak)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant County of Dane. (Bitar, Remzy) Modified on 4/8/2022. (lak)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Affidavit of Remzy D. Bitar re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint filed in Dane County Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dane County's Answer and Affirmative Defenses in Dane County Circuit Court) (Bitar, Remzy)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 22-CV-453. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3033979), filed County of Dane, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Dane County Circuit Court Summons and Complaint and Exhibits, #3 Dane County Circuit Court Answer and Affirmative Defenses) (Bitar, Remzy) Modified on 4/8/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaltenberg, Richard et al v. County of Dane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard John Kaltenberg
Represented By: John A. Kassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beth Kaltenberg
Represented By: John A. Kassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziegler Dairy Farms, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Kassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Dane
Represented By: Remzy Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?