Poyner, Matthew v. Demler, Wendy et al
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Poyner
Defendant: Wendy Demler, Tara Anderson, Sandra Enders and Does #1, #2
Case Number: 3:2022cv00199
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (lam),(ps)
May 9, 2022 Partial Filing fee received: $47.59, receipt number 34690040556. (lam),(ps)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $47.59 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/27/2022. (lam),(ps)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Matthew S. Poyner. (lam),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2022: #1 IPP Calculation) (lam).
April 27, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew S. Poyner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff submits $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 4/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/08/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Matthew S. Poyner. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Health Service Request, Tylenol Side Effects Articles, WEBMD Side Effects Articles, Change of Consultation Recommendations Form, Levsin Article, Zofran Article, and Miralax 17 Gram Oral Powder Packet Article, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poyner, Matthew v. Demler, Wendy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Poyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Demler
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Enders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does #1, #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?