United States of America v. Estate of Garnetta Thousand (Deceased) et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Garnetta Thousand (Deceased), Thomas Thousand, Sharon Thousand, Daniel Thousand, Unknown Heirs and Devisees of Garnetta Thousand and Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Case Number: 3:2022cv00201
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Service by Publication in Newspaper. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/3/2022. (voc)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 Declaration of Barbara L. Oswald filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: #10 Motion for Service by Publication (Oswald, Barbara)
June 1, 2022 Filing 10 Motion for Service by Publication in Newspaper by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Oswald, Barbara)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Good cause having been shown, pursuant to Rule 4(m), plaintiff's motion to extend its deadline to serve defendants (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED. The new deadline is August 31, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/31/2022. (voc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 Declaration of Barbara L. Oswald filed by Plaintiff United States of America re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time, (Oswald, Barbara)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff United States of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 6/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Oswald, Barbara)
May 20, 2022 Party Thomas Thousand, Daniel Thousand and Sharon Thousand are terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) without further order of the court. (voc/aw)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Oswald, Barbara)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sharon Thousand. Sharon Thousand waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Daniel Thousand. Daniel Thousand waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Thomas Thousand. Thomas Thousand waiver sent on 4/12/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 11.23.2005 Adjustable Rate Note, #3 Exhibit B - 12.19.2005 Adjustable Rate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - 09.17.2012 Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D - 11.23.2005 Adjustable Rate Second Note, #6 Exhibit E - 12.19.2005 Adjustable Rate Second Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F - Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit G - Statement of Account) (Oswald, Barbara)
April 11, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of Garnetta Thousand (Deceased) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Garnetta Thousand (Deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Thousand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Thousand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Thousand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs and Devisees of Garnetta Thousand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?