Davis, Paris v. Dr. Murphy et al
Plaintiff: Paris Davis
Defendant: Dr. Murphy and HSUS Man Adams
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00203
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/25/2022. (jef),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/25/2022. (jef),(ps)
April 25, 2022 PLRA Screening of Complaint. (jef),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number 34690040488. (jef),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds, and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is to submit the $402 Filing Fee by 5/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/12/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Paris Davis (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Signed Copy of #3 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Paris Davis. (aom),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 Signed copy of #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paris Davis. (aom),(ps)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds (unsigned) by Plaintiff Paris Davis. *See Dkt. #5 for signed copy. (aom),(ps) Modified on 4/11/2022 (aom).
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (unsigned) by Plaintiff Paris Davis. *See dkt. #4 for signed copy. (aom),(ps) Modified on 4/11/2022 (aom).
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Paris Davis. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis, Paris v. Dr. Murphy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSUS Man Adams
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?