Taylor, George v. Riboult, Justin et al
Plaintiff: George Taylor
Defendant: Dr. Justin Riboult, Dr. Murphy, Sheryl Kenyon, Jammie Adams, Mark Kartman, Jane Doe, John Doe, Unit Supervisor Jacob Cirian, Lt. Bresse and H. Gunderson
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00206
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 Supplemental Statement of Facts, and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff George Taylor. (aom),(ps)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to Add Supplemental Statement of Facts and Add a New Defendant by Plaintiff George Taylor. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff Regarding Filing Fee. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2022 Filing 9 Supplemental Statement of Facts filed by George Taylor re #8 Motion to Add Supplemental Statement of Facts. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2022 Filing 8 Motion to Add Supplemental Statement of Facts by Plaintiff George Taylor. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2022. (lam),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Paid prisoner PLRA Screening. (lam),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 34690040519. (lam),(ps)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 Exhibit 1A-B - WI DOC Progress Notes filed by George Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum Dated 01/04/22 From Corrections Program Supervisors Regarding Visitation Guidelines in Regards to Footwear, #2 Exhibit 3 - Office of Secretary Decision Complain Number WSPF-2022-982, #3 Exhibit 4 - WI DOC Medical Record Form, #4 Exhibit 5A-B - WI DOC Office Clinic Notes) (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/12/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 Declaration of George Taylor In Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff George Taylor (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff George Taylor (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff George Taylor. (aom),(ps)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by George Taylor. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor, George v. Riboult, Justin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Justin Riboult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Kenyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jammie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kartman
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Supervisor Jacob Cirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Bresse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?