Johnson, Holly v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., et al
Plaintiff: Holly Johnson, Sabrina Timmins, Stephanie Strong, Tonia Hobbs, Clynell Mickey and Elmira Hobbs
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and American Family Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00214
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Amended Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Elmira Hobbs, Tonia Hobbs, Holly Johnson, Clynell Mickey, Stephanie Strong, Sabrina Timmins re: #24 Motion to Dismiss, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., American Family Insurance Company (Edelsberg, Scott)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unsigned Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Holly Johnson re: #24 Motion to Dismiss, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., American Family Insurance Company. (Edelsberg, Scott) Modified on 8/26/2022: Signed brief filed? (lak)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 5/26/2023. Dispositive Motions due 1/5/2024. Settlement Letters due 6/7/2024. Motions in Limine due 6/14/2024. Response to Motion due 7/3/2024. First Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2024 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/8/2022. (rks)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/8/2022. (rks)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Brief in Support of #24 Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Missouri-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Johnson), #2 Exhibit 2 - Kansas-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Timmins), #3 Exhibit 3 - Minnesota-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Mickey), #4 Exhibit 4 - Wisconsin-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Hobbs), #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' insurance settlements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Zylstra letters to Andrew Shamis requesting appraisal) (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Brief in Opposition due 8/25/2022. Brief in Reply due 9/6/2022. (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/4/2022 [:15] (cak)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Discovery Plan (Shamis, Andrew)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Clynell Mickey, Holly Johnson, Elmira Hobbs, Sabrina Timmins. (Shamis, Andrew)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs seek leave to amend their complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 to remove an allegation and withdraw some of their claims. Dkt. #20 . Defendants don't oppose the motion, so plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED. The court accepts plaintiffs' amended complaint, Dkt. #20 -1, which plaintiffs should refile as a separate docket entry. The amended complaint moots defendants' pending motion to dismiss, Dkt. #15 , so that motion is DENIED. If defendants believe the amended complaint is deficient, they will have to file a new motion. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/15/2022. (jls)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Response to the Third Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Elmira Hobbs, Holly Johnson, Clynell Mickey, Sabrina Timmins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Third Amended Class Action Complaint) (Shamis, Andrew)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #17 Motion to Admit Scott Adam Edelsberg, I Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion to Admit Christopher Chagas Gold Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/7/2022. (lak)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to Admit Christopher Chagas Gold Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3087313.) by Plaintiffs Elmira Hobbs, Tonia Hobbs, Holly Johnson, Clynell Mickey, Stephanie Strong, Sabrina Timmins. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gold, Christopher)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to Admit Scott Adam Edelsberg, I Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3086741.) by Plaintiffs Elmira Hobbs, Tonia Hobbs, Holly Johnson, Clynell Mickey, Stephanie Strong, Sabrina Timmins. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Edelsberg, Scott)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Brief in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Missouri-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Johnson), #2 Exhibit 2 - Kansas-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Timmins), #3 Exhibit 3 - Minnesota-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Mickey), #4 Exhibit 4 - Wisconsin-Plaintiff Insurance Policy (Hobbs), #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' insurance settlements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Atty. Zylstra letters to Atty. Shamis requesting appraisal) (Zylstra, Sarah)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Brief in Opposition due 7/21/2022. Brief in Reply due 8/1/2022. (Zylstra, Sarah)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 Amended Complaint; American Family Insurance Company answer due 6/30/2022; American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. answer due 6/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/13/2022. (jls)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Joan E. Hayner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/10/2022. (lak)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Admit Joan E Hayner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3071982.) by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hayner, Joan)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., filed by Clynell Mickey, Holly Johnson, Elmira Hobbs, Sabrina Timmins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Sabrina Timmins's Market Valuation Report, #3 Exhibit C- Holly Johnson's Market Valuation Report, #4 Exhibit D- Clynell Mickey's Market Valuation Report, #5 Exhibit E- Elmira Hobbs's Market Valuation Report) (Shamis, Andrew)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to amend their complaint, Dkt. #8 , is GRANTED. The court will accept plaintiffs' proposed amended complaint, Dkt. #8 -1, which plaintiffs should refile as a separate docket entry. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/8/2022. (jls)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed Motion to Amend #7 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Tonia Hobbs, Holly Johnson, Stephanie Strong, Sabrina Timmins. Brief in Opposition due 6/15/2022. Brief in Reply due 6/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Class Action Complaint) (Shamis, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Company, filed by Holly Johnson, Sabrina Timmins, Stephanie Strong, Tonia Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Sabrina Timmins Market Valuation Report, #3 Exhibit C- Holly Johnson Market Valuation Report, #4 Exhibit D- Stephanie Strong Market Valuation Report, #5 Exhibit E- Tonia Hobbs Market Valuation Report) (Shamis, Andrew)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. American Family Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/5/2022. (rks)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Anne Zylstra for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/18/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Shamis, Andrew)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (lak)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Mutual Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3037242.), filed by Holly Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Market Valuation Report, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Holly v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Johnson
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Timmins
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Strong
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Hobbs
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clynell Mickey
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmira Hobbs
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Joan E Hayner
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Joan E Hayner
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?