Arash, Mohammad v. The Mission Essential Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Mohammad Arash
Defendant: The Mission Essential Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00222
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/31/2022. (voc)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Anthony Patrick McNamara Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/31/2022. (lak)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant The Mission Essential Group, LLC. (McNamara, Anthony)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Anthony Patrick McNamara Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3066158.) by Defendant The Mission Essential Group, LLC. (McNamara, Anthony)
May 31, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: The Mission Essential Group, LLC answer due 6/28/2022. (voc)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed. The Mission Essential Group, LLC served on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Mission Essential Group, LLC. (lak)
April 21, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 21, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mohammad Arash. (Sanford, Joshua)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Mission Essential Group, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-3040562.), filed by Mohammad Arash. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sanford, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arash, Mohammad v. The Mission Essential Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Arash
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mission Essential Group, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Patrick McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?