Clark, William et al v. St. Croix County, WI et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Jon Bevers, Clark H William, III, Jeffrey Johnson and William H. Clark, III
Defendant: St. Croix County, WI, State of WI, Prosecution, Police and Judical
Case Number: 3:2022cv00230
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from plaintiff William H. Clark regarding being the only plaintiff in the case and that the defendant is the State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson's Initial partial filing fee of $ 40.50 assessed. Plaintiff Johnson's Initial partial filing fee due 7/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/15/2022. (jef),(ps)
June 13, 2022 Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2022: #2 IPP Calculation) (jef).
June 2, 2022 Filing 15 Clerk's office response to the dkt. #13 letter from plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Filing 14 Warden PLRA Letter as to William Clark. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Initial Partial Filing fee received from plaintiff William H. Clark: $ 17.16, receipt number 34690040687. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Plaintiff Trevor Jon Bevers terminated, no filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis submitted by the May 16, 2022 deadline. (jef),(ps)
May 31, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson providing permission to withdraw $402 from plaintiff's bank account. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from plaintiff William Clark, III regarding inability to pay the initial partial filing fee payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson's Trust Fund Account Statement due 6/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff William H. Clark's Initial partial filing fee of $ 17.16 assessed. Clark's Initial partial filing fee due 6/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Clark H William, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 Letter that this lawsuit needs amendments regarding the defendants by Plaintiff Clark H William, III. (jef),(ps)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 Inmate Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Clark H William, III. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2022: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
May 6, 2022 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clark H William, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff Johnson submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/25/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff Clark submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/25/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff Bevers submit a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/25/2022. (aom),(ps)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark, William et al v. St. Croix County, WI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Jon Bevers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark H William, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Croix County, WI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of WI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?