Neubauer, Taylor v. Sperl Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Neubauer
Defendant: Sperl Inc doing business as Subway, Sperl Inc. doing business as Subway and Michelle L. Sperl
Case Number: 3:2022cv00236
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. Michelle L. Sperl served on 5/15/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Maynard, Timothy)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Sperl Inc. served on 5/15/2022, answer due 7/1/2022. (Maynard, Timothy)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #5 Stipulation of Extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint and to toll the FLSA statutes of limitations for the putative collective class, extension granted. Michelle L. Sperl, Sperl Inc. answer due 7/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/25/2022. (rks)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 Stipulation fo Extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint and to toll the flsa statutes of limitations for the putative collective class by Defendants Michelle L. Sperl, Sperl Inc.. (Tobin, Matthew)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew James Tobin for Defendants Michelle L. Sperl, Sperl Inc.. (Tobin, Matthew)
April 28, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
April 28, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 28, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Taylor Neubauer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join, Harlie Krueger, #2 Certificate of Service) (Maynard, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3045982.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Sperl Inc., d/b/a Subway, #3 Summons as to Registered Agent Michelle Sperl, #4 Exhibit A - Consent form for Taylor Neubauer) (Maynard, Timothy) Modified on 4/28/2022: Changed county from Dane to Clark. Added second defendant. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neubauer, Taylor v. Sperl Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Neubauer
Represented By: Timothy Peter Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sperl Inc doing business as Subway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sperl Inc. doing business as Subway
Represented By: Matthew James Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L. Sperl
Represented By: Matthew James Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?