United States of America v. Phon, Proeun et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Proeun Phon, Saroeun Phon, Khouch Kim, Dane County, Wisconsin, Wisconsin Department of Revenue, Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development, City of Madison, Wisconsin and Ally Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00240
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER by Defendant Dane County, Wisconsin. (lak)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Dane County, Wisconsin (Susan Rauti). (lak)
June 24, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Susan Rauti for Defendant Dane County, Wisconsin. (lak)
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 Disregard. Modified on 6/24/2022. (lak)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam Y. Ben-Zikri for Defendant Wisconsin Department of Revenue. (Ben-Zikri, Adam)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER by Defendant City of Madison, Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Delinquent Property Tax and Water Bills) (Staffaroni, Jaime)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Defendant Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development as to #4 Waiver of Service Executed, #3 Notice of Appearance, #5 Answer. (Rubsam, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development. (Rubsam, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development. Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development waiver sent on 5/10/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. (Rubsam, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew John Rubsam for Defendant Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development. (Rubsam, Andrew)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to defendant Proeun Phon, #3 Summons as to defendant Saroeun Phon, #4 Summons as to defendant Khouch Kim, #5 Summons as to defendant Dane County, Wisconsin, #6 Summons as to defendant Wisconsin Department of Revenue, #7 Summons as to defendant Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development, #8 Summons as to defendant City of Madison, Wisconsin, #9 Summons as to defendant Ally Financial, Inc.) (Suenram, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 29, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Phon, Proeun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher Francis Suenram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proeun Phon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saroeun Phon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khouch Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County, Wisconsin
Represented By: Susan Rauti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Revenue
Represented By: Adam Y. Ben-Zikri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development
Represented By: Andrew John Rubsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Madison, Wisconsin
Represented By: Jaime L. Staffaroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?