Hamann, Jack v. Magno, Conrad et al
Plaintiff: Jack John C Hamann
Defendant: Dr. Conrad Magno, DDS and Wisconsin Secure Program Facility
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00245
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 13 Clerk's office response to dkt. #7 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (jef),(ps)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendant Conrad Magno, DDS. (Pfefferle, Kathryn),(ps)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn Ann Pfefferle for Defendant Conrad Magno, DDS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Pfefferle, Kathryn),(ps)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendant Conrad Magno, DDS. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Wisconsin Secure Program Facility. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/23/2022. (jef),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Filing fee received: $ 60.84, receipt number 34690040613. (jef),(ps)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from plaintiff regarding the initial partial filing fee payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (aom),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 60.84 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/02/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jack John C Hamann (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jack John C Hamann. (aom),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Brief in Support of #1 Complaint filed by Jack John C Hamann. (aom),(ps)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jack John C Hamann. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Complaint Number WSPF-2021-2605 Documents, Patient Progress Notes, Inmate Complaint, Inmate Complaint Appeal, Interview/Information Request, Health Service Request, ICE Therapy Ordering Information, and Complaint Number WSPF-2021-2707 Document, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamann, Jack v. Magno, Conrad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack John C Hamann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Conrad Magno, DDS
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Pfefferle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Secure Program Facility
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?