McNaughton, Nathan v. The School District of Amery
Plaintiff: Nathan Dale McNaughton
Defendant: The School District of Amery
Case Number: 3:2022cv00247
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 8 Letter from plaintiff providing proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Defendant The School District of Amery as to #5 Notice of Appearance, #6 Answer, #4 Notice of Appearance. (Heberling, Cecilia),(ps)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant The School District of Amery. (Heberling, Cecilia),(ps)
June 14, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2022 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Plaintiff responsible for contacting the court at (608) 264-5153. Once plaintiff's call has been received, the court will then include counsel for defendant in the conference call. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef),(ps)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Cecilia Heberling for Defendant The School District of Amery. (Heberling, Cecilia),(ps)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendant The School District of Amery. (Lubinsky, Lori),(ps)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Disregard. Modified on 6/13/2022. (lak)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The School District of Amery. Mailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Wis. Stats. 801.11, #2 Clerk's office cover letter) (jef),(ps)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 34690040535), filed by Nathan Dale McNaughton. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Copy of a Dismissal and Notice of Rights from the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Case Charge Number 443-2021-01571, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNaughton, Nathan v. The School District of Amery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Dale McNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The School District of Amery
Represented By: Cecilia Heberling
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?