Pak, Melody et al v. Biden, Joseph et al
Plaintiff: Melody Pak, Ali Pak, Maryam Fatouraei, Vahid Fatouraee, Kambiz Fathinejad, Armin Fathinejad, John Doe (1) and John Doe (2)
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Merrick Garland, Christopher A. Wray, Alejandro Mayorkas, Antony Blinken, Gentry Smith, Sean Murphy, Lynne M. Tracy and William Laitinen
Case Number: 3:2022cv00250
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Joint Stipulation to Extend the Defendants' Response Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/9/2022. (kwf)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Given the length of this extension, the court is unlikely to grant another. (Sealed Document) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/8/2022. (voc)
June 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: As to All Defendants. (voc)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, William Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sean Murphy, Gentry Smith, Lynne M. Tracy, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Turcios, Victoria)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 Notice by Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, William Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sean Murphy, Gentry Smith, Lynne M. Tracy, Christopher A. Wray re: #5 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Defendants' Response Taking No Position. (Turcios, Victoria)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by P. Angel Martinez for Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, William Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sean Murphy, Gentry Smith, Lynne M. Tracy, Christopher A. Wray. (Martinez, P.)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Victoria Elizabeth Turcios for Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, William Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sean Murphy, Gentry Smith, Lynne M. Tracy, Christopher A. Wray. (Turcios, Victoria)
May 19, 2022 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #5 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Brief in Opposition due 7/5/2022. Brief in Reply due 7/12/2022. (kwf)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Brief in Support of #5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Plaintiffs John Doe (1), John Doe (2), Armin Fathinejad, Kambiz Fathinejad, Vahid Fatouraee, Maryam Fatouraei, Ali Pak, Melody Pak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Motion to Seal Granted, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Lotfi, Shabnam)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Plaintiffs John Doe (1), John Doe (2), Armin Fathinejad, Kambiz Fathinejad, Vahid Fatouraee, Maryam Fatouraei, Ali Pak, Melody Pak. Response due 5/25/2022. (Lotfi, Shabnam)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 Disregard. Modified on 5/19/2022. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service as to Defendants Joseph R. Biden, Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, William Laitinen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Sean Murphy, Gentry Smith, Lynne M. Tracy, Christopher A. Wray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts) (Lotfi, Shabnam) Modified on 5/9/2022. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 6, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3051377.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Pak I-140 Approval Notice, #2 Exhibit B. Pak Refusal Letter, #3 Exhibit C. Pak Emails, #4 Exhibit D. Doe I-129F Receipt Notice, #5 Exhibit E. Doe I-129F Approval Notice, #6 Exhibit F. Doe Refusal Letter 1, #7 Exhibit G. Doe Refusal Letter 2, #8 Exhibit H. Doe Emails, #9 Exhibit I. Fatouraee Refusal Letter, #10 Exhibit J. Fatouraee Emails with Embassy, #11 Exhibit K. Fatouraee Email with LegalNet, #12 Exhibit L. Fathinejad Emails, #13 Exhibit M. Fathinejad Refusal Letter, #14 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons Biden, #16 Summons Garland, #17 Summons Wray, #18 Summons Mayorkas, #19 Summons Blinken, #20 Summons Smith, #21 Summons Murphy, #22 Summons Tracy, #23 Summons Laitinen, #24 Summons US Attorney) (Lotfi, Shabnam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pak, Melody et al v. Biden, Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Pak
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Pak
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryam Fatouraei
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahid Fatouraee
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kambiz Fathinejad
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armin Fathinejad
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe (1)
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe (2)
Represented By: Veronica Sustic
Represented By: Shabnam Lotfi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentry Smith
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Murphy
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne M. Tracy
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Laitinen
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Turcios
Represented By: P. Angel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?