DCI Reedsburg, LLC et al v. Longan, Neil et al
Plaintiff: DCI Reedsburg, LLC and Parkview Bed & Breakfast, LLC
Defendant: Neil E. Longan, N. Lorraine Longan and Start Me Up, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00251
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 Brief in Support of #16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants N. Lorraine Longan, Neil E. Longan, Start Me Up, LLC (Sage, Roger)
June 17, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants N. Lorraine Longan, Neil E. Longan, Start Me Up, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 7/8/2022. Brief in Reply due 7/18/2022. (Sage, Roger)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Dispositive Motions due 2/24/2023. Settlement Letters due 6/20/2023. Motions in Limine due 6/23/2023. Response to Motion due 7/7/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2023 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/26/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/9/2022. (voc)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of plaintiffs' second amended complaint (dkt. #13 ), submitted in response to this court's order regarding jurisdiction (dkt. #10 ). Having reviewed the amended complaint, the court is now satisfied that it has subject matter over this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Plaintiffs DCI Reedsburg, LLC, and Parkview Bed & Breakfast, LLC are citizens of Wisconsin; defendants Neil Longan, N. Lorraine Longan and Start Me Up LLC are citizens of Missouri; and the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. (2d Am. Compl. (dkt. #13 ) para. 2-15.) Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/3/2022. (voc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Organizational Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Order appointing Receiver, #3 Exhibit C - Start Me Up Organizational Documents, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Judgment, #5 Exhibit E - Closing Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Wire-disbursement instructions) (Lietz-Ray, Lisa)
June 2, 2022 Filing 12 Disregard. To be refiled. Modified on 6/2/2022. (lak)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Sage, Roger)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 6/10/2022. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/27/2022. (voc)
May 26, 2022 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff DCI Reedsburg, LLC. (Turke, Mary)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against N. Lorraine Longan, Neil E. Longan and Start Me Up, LLC, filed by DCI Reedsburg, LLC and Parkview Bed & Breakfast, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Organization and Articles of Organization, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Closing Disclosure, #4 Exhibit D - Document from Wisconsin Title Group, LLC) (lak)
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 Disregard. Modified on 5/20/2022. (lak)
May 16, 2022 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 5/25/2022. (lak)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Carolyn Turke for Plaintiff DCI Reedsburg, LLC. (Turke, Mary)
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa K. Lietz-Ray for Plaintiff DCI Reedsburg, LLC. (Lietz-Ray, Lisa)
May 12, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendants N. Lorraine Longan, Neil E. Longan, Start Me Up, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage Payoff Note) (Sage, Roger)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Service by Defendants N. Lorraine Longan, Neil E. Longan, Start Me Up, LLC. (Sage, Roger)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Start Me Up, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing) (Sage, Roger) Modified on 5/5/2022. (lak)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sauk County Circuit Court, case number 22CV124. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3050729), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint and Exhibits, #3 Consent to Removal, #4 Certificate of Mailing) (Sage, Roger) Modified on 5/5/2022. (lak)
May 5, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
May 5, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DCI Reedsburg, LLC et al v. Longan, Neil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCI Reedsburg, LLC
Represented By: Lisa K. Lietz-Ray
Represented By: Mary Carolyn Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkview Bed & Breakfast, LLC
Represented By: Lisa K. Lietz-Ray
Represented By: Mary Carolyn Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil E. Longan
Represented By: Roger Alan Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Lorraine Longan
Represented By: Roger Alan Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Start Me Up, LLC
Represented By: Roger Alan Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?