Spencer, Heru v. The Church of Prismatic Light et al
Plaintiff: Heru Spencer
Defendant: The Church of Prismatic Light, Tiffany Wait, Katrina Rose Wolff, Jeri Clark and Ida Hamilton
Case Number: 3:2022cv00257
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 Summonses Reissued as to Defendants The Church of Prismatic Light, et al. Forwarded to the U.S. Marshals for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Tiffany Wait, #2 Summons as to Katrina Rose Wolff, #3 Summons as to Jeri Clark, #4 Summons as to Ida Hamilton) (jef),(ps)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that plaintiff Heru Spencer's renewed motion for a temporary restraining order (dkt. #9 ) is DENIED. Defendants may still have twenty-one days from the date of service to respond to plaintiff's motions for a preliminary injunction (dkt. # #4 , #6 ) as they relate to his pre-screened trademark claims, but the remainder of those motions are DENIED IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewal to the extent based on non-trademark claims, including slander, defamation or threats. The clerk's office shall again prepare appropriate summons and the U.S. Marshal Service shall attempt diligently service upon defendants. Further filings not plainly relating to the screened and approved trademark claims will be deemed MOOT unless and until approved to go forward by this court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/14/2022. (lam),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2022: #1 WIWD Procedure on Motions for Injunctive Relief) (lam).
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from plaintiff regarding addresses for Tiffany Wait and The Church of Prismatic Light. (jef),(ps)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 Marshal Service Return Unexecuted as to All Defendants. (jef),(ps) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/10/2022) (jef).
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 Letter providing USB drive with video Exhibits A 1-3 and B 1-3 by Plaintiff Heru Spencer. (jef),(ps) USB thumb drive received with letter. (jef)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as to Tiffany Wait by Plaintiff Heru Spencer. (Spencer, Heru),(ps) Modified docket text on 6/8/2022 (jef).
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jeri Clark, Ida Hamilton, The Church of Prismatic Light, Tiffany Wait, and Katrina Rose Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Tiffany Wait, #2 Summons Issued as to Katrina Rose Wolff, #3 Summons Issued as to Jeri Clark, #4 Summons Issued as to Ida Hamilton). Materials forwarded to USMS for service. (lam),(ps)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed on claims under the Lanham Act and Wisconsin common law as set forth above against defendants the Church of Prismatic Light, Tiffany Wait, Katrina Rose Wolff, Jeri Clark, and Ida Hamilton. Service to be made by USMS. Defendants' response to plaintiff's motions for a preliminary injunction (dkt. # #4 , #6 ) is due twenty-one days from the date of service. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/26/2022. (lam),(ps)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Heru Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Heru Spencer. (lam),(ps)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Heru Spencer. (Spencer, Heru),(ps) Modified docket text to match title of document on 5/23/2022 (jef).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/9/2022. (lam),(ps)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Heru Spencer. (lam)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Heru Spencer. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (lam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer, Heru v. The Church of Prismatic Light et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heru Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Church of Prismatic Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Wait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Rose Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?