LaBrec, Matthew v. Lavoie, Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Goodvine and Matthew LaBrec
Defendant: Dr. Daniel Lavoie, Dr. Murphy, Dr. Ribault, Ms. Kramer, Ms. Block, Ms. Fofana, Rachel Snow, Kera Haase, Rose Howell and Denise Valerius
Not Classified By Court: CCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2022cv00284
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff is proceeding on several claims against multiple defendants regarding his medical care in prison. He has now submitted an amended complaint that doesn't simply add new defendants and new claims; it also changes the structure and the narrative of the original complaint. Dkt. #24 . This makes it more difficult to determine what changes plaintiff intended to make. To assist with screening the amended complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915A, plaintiff may have until July 26, 2022, to submit a short brief that includes the following information: (1) what claims plaintiff is attempting to add to the case; (2) whether he is seeking reconsideration of any the claims I dismissed in the original screening order, and, if so, what new allegations support those claims; and (3) whether he is continuing to assert all of the claims on which I allowed him to proceed, and, if not, which claims he wishes to dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/13/2022. (jef),(ps)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Letter from plaintiff requesting to attach exhibits 15, 17, 18 and 19 from dkt. 1 to the Amended Complaint and providing medical authorization. (Attachments: #1 Authorization and Informed Consent for Use and Disclosure of Medical Information) (jef),(ps)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intake Screening and Medical History, #2 Exhibit 2 - Off-site Service Request and Report, MRI Screening Form, Radiology Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Off-site Service Request, order sheet, after visit summary, #4 Exhibit 4 - Off-site Service Request, EMG/NCS Lab results, #5 Exhibit 5 - Medications, Health Services rejection letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Progress Notes, #7 Exhibit 7 - Prescriber's Orders, #8 Exhibit 8 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 9 - Health Service Request, #10 Exhibit 10 - Health Service Request, #11 Exhibit 11 - Gabapentin information, #12 Exhibit 12 - Progress Notes, #13 Exhibit 13 - Inmate Complaint documents, #14 Exhibit 14 - Inmate Complaint documents, #15 Exhibit 16 - refiling due to missing page - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report) (jef),(ps)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef/jmm),(ps)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (jef),(ps)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L Grzebielski for Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Carson, Gesina),(ps)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendants Kramer, Daniel Lavoie, Ribault. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Carson, Gesina),(ps)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Ribault, Kramer, Daniel Lavoie. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/15/2022. (jef),(ps)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Warden PLRA Letter as to Matthew LaBrec. (jef),(ps)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that plaintiff Christopher Goodvine and Matthew Labrec's claims are SEVERED. Labrec's case will proceed under this case number. The clerk of court is directed to open a new case for Goodvine that includes the following defendants: Daniel Lavoie, Dr. Murphy, Ms. Block, Ms. Fofana, Rachel Snow, Kera Haase, Rose Howell, and Denise Valerius. Defendants Block, Fofana, Snow, Haase, Howell, and Valerius are DISMISSED from this case because Labrec hasn't asserted any claims against them. The claims of each plaintiff will be screened in separate orders. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/7/2022. (jef),(ps)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Partial Filing fee received from Matthew LaBrec $ 113.71, receipt number 34690040701. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Warden PLRA Letter as to Christopher Goodvine. (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Partial Filing fee received from Christopher Goodvine : $ 0.79, receipt number 34690040647. (jef),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff Goodvine: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.79 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/20/2022. (aom),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (Attachments: #1 Disbursement Request, #2 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff LaBrec Regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (aom),(ps)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to Correct Docket. Alternatively, Letter to Clerk Regarding Docket by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Sworn Statement of Proposed Facts filed by Christopher A. Goodvine. (aom),(ps)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Copy of Sworn Statement of Facts/ Second half of #6 Declaration by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom),(ps) Modified on 5/20/2022 (aom).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff Goodvine submits a $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/19/2022. (aom)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request for Plaintiff LaBrec: Initial partial filing fee of $ 113.71 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 05/19/2022. (aom)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec (Attachments: #1 Copy of Interview/Information Request, #2 Copy of Disbursement Request, #3 IPP Calculation) (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing filed by Plaintiff Christopher A. Goodvine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/06/21 and Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 002 - Patient Education Instructions Regarding Meloxicam Oral Tablet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Health Service Request and Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 10/21/21, #4 Exhibit 004 - Complaint Number CCI-2021-16330 Documents, #5 Exhibit 005 - Health Service Requests, #6 Exhibit 006 - To be Filed Separately, #7 Exhibit 007 - Letter dated 03/13/22 Regarding Meloxicam, #8 Exhibit 008 - Health Service Requests, #9 Exhibit 009 - Health Service Requests, #10 Exhibit 010 - Letters from Health Service Unit Dated 02/18/22 and 03/03/2022 and Interview/Information Request, #11 Exhibit 011 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 03/10/22, #12 Exhibit 012 - Letter Sent to Warden Fuchs on 03/03/22 (Very Faint), #13 Exhibit 013 - Letter from Health Service Nursing Coordinator Rachel Snow Dated 03/30/22 and Interview/Information Request, #14 Exhibit 014 - Letter from Health Service Unit Dated 02/19/22, #15 Exhibit 015 - Off-Site Service Request and Reports and Prescription Order, #16 Exhibit 016 - Off-Site Service Request and Report and Ascension Mercy Hospital Radiology Report, #17 Exhibit 017 - Letter from Dr. Ribault dated 09/21/20, #18 Exhibit 018 - Letter to Dr. Ribault Dated 11/15/20, #19 Exhibit 019 - Health Service Requests) (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Brief in Support of #4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application for Preliminary Injunction with an Expedited Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiffs Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Sworn Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Matthew LaBrec. (aom)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Christopher A. Goodvine, Matthew LaBrec. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaBrec, Matthew v. Lavoie, Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Goodvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew LaBrec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Daniel Lavoie
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ribault
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Kramer
Represented By: Gesina S. Carson
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Fofana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kera Haase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Valerius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: CCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?