Walsh, Martin v. Push Underground Construction LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh and Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: Push Underground Construction LLC, Stanley Web and Amanda Web
Case Number: 3:2022cv00304
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Good causing having been shown, plaintiff's motion for an extension of time and for service by the USMS is GRANTED. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), it is ORDERED that plaintiff's deadline to serve the defendant is extended to October 24, 2022. Pursuant to Rule 4[c](3), it is FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve plaintiff's summons and complaint on all defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/22/2022. (rks)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 Brief in Support of #4 Motion for Extension of Time, by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (lak)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants via U.S. Marshal by Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 7/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Disregard) (Napier, Julia) Modified on 7/21/2022. (lak)
July 12, 2022 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (jls)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Julia Napier for Plaintiff Martin J. Walsh. (Napier, Julia) Modified on 7/6/2022. (lak)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
May 27, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
May 27, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Employees, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Push Underground Construction LLC, #4 Summons Stanley Web an individual, #5 Summons Amanda Web an individual) (Ringstad, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh, Martin v. Push Underground Construction LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Linda Joy Ringstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Julia Napier
Represented By: Linda Joy Ringstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Push Underground Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Web
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Web
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?