Maynard, Cody v. Keys, R.D.
Petitioner: Cody Maynard
Respondent: R.D. Keys
Case Number: 3:2022cv00369
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certified Mail Receipt returned as to Attorney General of the United States. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter to Judge Conley from petitioner regarding information sent to court. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Submission regarding information sent to the court, petitioner's response to the government's reply and other issues by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Letter from petitioner enclosing statements, letters and rules. (Attachments: #1 Letter regarding similar circumstance, #2 Letter from Michael Miles, #3 Federal Register excerpts Rules and Regulations, #4 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter to Judge Conley from petitioner. (jef),(ps)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Submission Regarding Warden R.D. Keys Response re: First Step Act Credit by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Request to Staff, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certified Mail Receipts Returned as to Warden Randy Keyes. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipt as to U.S. Attorney) (jef),(ps)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Certified Mail Receipts sent to Warden Randy Keyes, U.S. Attorney Timothy O'Shea, and Attorney General Merrick Garland. (lam),(ps)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Petitioner Cody Maynard seeks reconsideration of the court's dismissal of this case without prejudice, detailing his repeated unsuccessful efforts to obtain forms to calculate his FSA good time credits and his belief that he is entitled to 250 days of sentence credit and immediate release to a halfway house. (Dkt. #12 .) The attachments to his motion show that Maynard has petitioned the warden of his institution for application of his FSA credit and/or to reclassify him as a low risk of recidivism (dkt. #12-2, at 1-4), and Maynard represents he has received no response. This new information suggests that Maynard may have a stronger argument that exhaustion would be futile, so Maynard's motion is GRANTED, and this case is REOPENED. The clerk of court is directed to serve the petition on respondent at FCI-Oxford, the local United States Attorney, and the United States Attorney General by certified mail, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). Given petitioner's request for immediate release, the court will expedite briefing, giving respondent until September 2, 2022, to answer the petition. Petitioner's reply is due September 9, 2022. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/12/2022. (lam),(ps)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for Reconsideration re #9 Order by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Individualized Needs Plan - Program Review, #2 Emails regarding inmate work assignment, #3 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amendment for Motion for Immediate Release to pre-release or home confinement, dated 7/29/22, filed by Cody Maynard (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered dismissing the petition for a writ of habeas corpus without prejudice. (jat),(ps)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal; denying #3 Motion to proceed without exhausting administrative remedy; denying #4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/1/22. (jat),(ps)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to Supplement #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal with exhibits by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits: Cody Maynard TRULINCS messages to Case Management Coordinator and Unit Management East, #2 Envelope). (lam),(ps)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/14/2022. (jef),(ps)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (jef),(ps)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (jef),(ps)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion to Expedite by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (jef),(ps)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion to proceed without exhausting administrative remedy by Petitioner Cody Maynard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that petitioner is to submit $5 filing fee or motion for leave to proceed IFP with a trust fund account statement by 7/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/7/2022. (lam),(ps)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal, filed by Cody Maynard. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maynard, Cody v. Keys, R.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cody Maynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R.D. Keys
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?