Kowarsky v. American Family Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nathan Kowarsky
Defendant: American Family Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00377
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time by Defendant American Family Life Insurance Company. Brief in Reply due 9/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/31/2022. (arw)
August 31, 2022 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Reply Brief by Defendant American Family Life Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 26, 2022 Filing 38 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Nathan Kowarsky re: #33 Motion to Dismiss filed by American Family Life Insurance Company (Bolce, Cody)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Standing Order Relating to the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in a Complex Civil Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2022. (voc)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Motion to Certify Class under Rule 23 due 6/2/2023. Dispositive Motions due 12/1/2023. Settlement Letters due 4/26/2024. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 5/3/2024. Responses due 5/17/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/10/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2022. (voc)
August 18, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/16/2022 [:15] (cak)
August 11, 2022 Filing 35 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Nathan Kowarsky (Bolce, Cody)
August 5, 2022 Filing 34 Brief in Support of #33 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant American Family Life Insurance Company (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 5, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant American Family Life Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 8/26/2022. Brief in Reply due 9/6/2022. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #31 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. American Family Life Insurance Company answer due 8/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/14/2022. (arw)
July 13, 2022 Filing 31 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by Defendant American Family Life Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 11, 2022 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00939. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Western District of Wisconsin. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 11, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (lak)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Motion to Change Venue. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2022)[Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2022 re #15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. Matter is taken under submission. The Court will issue a written order. Digital Recording Time: 9:30-9:38. Attorney for Plaintiff: Cody Bolce. Attorney for Defendant: Christopher Assise. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing Re: #15 MOTION to Change Venue currently set for 6/13/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58.Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup:#https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
May 4, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byAmerican Family Life Insurance Company. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 5/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #24 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/18/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
May 2, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nathan Kowarsky. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 5/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Family Life Insurance Company.. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 4/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 4/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 4/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 28, 2022 #Electronic filing error. The case number is incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct case number 22-cv-00939 SK and the United States Dis trict Court for the Northern District of California in future filings. Re: #20 Certificate of Service filed by Nathan Kowarsky. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nathan Kowarsky re #19 Opposition/Response to Motion (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 4/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byNathan Kowarsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cole, Scott) (Filed on 4/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Filing 18 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nathan Kowarsky.. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 4/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/29/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2022 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 4/27/2022. Replies due by 5/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Szafranski, #2 Declaration Hunt)(Commons, Sean) (Filed on 4/13/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION to enlarge time to answer or otherwise plead filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 4/12/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Assise. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to T. Robert Scarborough. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/15/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Kowarsky. American Family Life Insurance Company served on 2/28/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. See Dkt # 7 re: Answer Due Date (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 4/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17045689.) filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. (Assise, Christopher) (Filed on 3/31/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17045636.) filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. (Scarborough, T.) (Filed on 3/31/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by American Family Life Insurance Company. (Commons, Sean) (Filed on 3/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/18/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Family Life Insurance Company. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)[Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 2/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]
February 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16908109.). Filed byNathan Kowarsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 2/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowarsky v. American Family Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kowarsky
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean Ashley Commons
Represented By: Christopher M. Assise
Represented By: T. Robert Scarborough
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?