Parents Protecting Our Children, UA v. Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Parents Protecting Our Children, UA
Defendant: Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Tim Nordin, Lori Bica, Marquell Johnson, Phil Lyons, Joshua Clements, Stephanie Farrar, Erica Zerr and Michael Johnson
Amicus Curiae: Kristoffer J. Martin
Case Number: 3:2022cv00508
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 21 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr dismissing the case. (jat)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss, dkt. #11 , is GRANTED, and themotion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief, dkt. #10 , is DENIED as unnecessary. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/21/2023. (voc)
December 19, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Parents Protecting Our Children, UA re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion and Order from Deanda v. Becerra, ND TX, 20-cv-092) (Barry, Nicholas)
December 16, 2022 Filing 18 Brief in Reply by Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss, (Stadler, Ronald)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Dispositive Motions due 6/30/2023. Settlement Letters due 10/20/2023. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 10/27/2023. Responses due 11/9/2023. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2023 at 02:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Jury Selection and Trial set for 12/4/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/14/2022. (acd)
December 14, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/8/2022 [:25] (mfh)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At the December 8, 2022 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, the court granted defendants' request to extend their reply deadline on the pending dismissal motion #11 . The new deadline is December 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/8/2022. (arw)
December 2, 2022 Filing 15 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Parents Protecting Our Children, UA re: #11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Erica Zerr, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Lori Bica, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Michael Johnson, Marquell Johnson, Stephanie Farrar (Berg, Luke)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr (Stadler, Ronald)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendants) (lak)
November 10, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (acd)
November 8, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint. Brief in Opposition due 12/2/2022. Brief in Reply due 12/12/2022. (acd)
November 8, 2022 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 11/18/2022. (lak)
November 7, 2022 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr (Stadler, Ronald)
November 7, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint by Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr. Brief in Opposition due 11/28/2022. Brief in Reply due 12/8/2022. (Stadler, Ronald)
October 18, 2022 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to File Brief on Behalf of the Eau Claire Area LGBTQI+ Community as Amicus Curiae In Support of the Defendants by Amicus Kristoffer J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (acd)
September 13, 2022 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Ronald S. Stadler. (Berg, Luke) Modified on 9/16/2022. (arw)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Reed D. Rubinstein Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Admit Nicholas Barry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/12/2022. (lak)
September 9, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Nicholas Barry Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3121657.) by Plaintiff Parents Protecting Our Children, UA. (Barry, Nicholas)
September 9, 2022 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Reed Darrow Rubinstein Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3121375.) by Plaintiff Parents Protecting Our Children, UA. (Rubinstein, Reed)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Edward Sacks for Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr. (Sacks, Jonathan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald S. Stadler for Defendants Lori Bica, Joshua Clements, Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin, Stephanie Farrar, Marquell Johnson, Michael Johnson, Phil Lyons, Tim Nordin, Erica Zerr. (Stadler, Ronald)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard M. Esenberg for Plaintiff Parents Protecting Our Children, UA. (Esenberg, Richard)
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3119969.), filed by Parents Protecting Our Children, UA, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Eau Claire Area School District Administrative Guidance for Gender Identity Support, #4 Exhibit B - Confidential Gender Support Plan, #5 Exhibit C - 2021-2022 ECASD Equity PD for All Staff (Berg, Luke) Modified on 9/7/2022: Edited. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
September 7, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
September 7, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parents Protecting Our Children, UA v. Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parents Protecting Our Children, UA
Represented By: Richard M. Esenberg
Represented By: Luke Berg
Represented By: Nicholas Barry
Represented By: Reed Darrow Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eau Claire Area School District, Wisconsin
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Nordin
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Bica
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquell Johnson
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lyons
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Clements
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Farrar
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Zerr
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kristoffer J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?