Davis, Harry et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harry T Davis, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield and Harry T. Davis
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., ABC Incorporated, a fictitious entity, XYZ Insurance Company and ABC Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2022cv00545
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due 9/29/2023. Settlement Letters due 1/19/2024. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 1/26/2024. Responses due 2/9/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2024 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/11/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/21/2022. (rks)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At the November 18, 2022 telephonic preliminary pretrial conference, plaintiff made an oral request to try this case in Eau Claire, a request that defendant does not oppose. Having been alerted to this preference, the court will notify the parties as soon as it has made its decision on trial location. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/21/2022. (rks)
November 21, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/18/2022 [:15] (cak)
November 15, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 01:30 PM rescheduled to 11:00 AM the same date to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Lubinsky, Lori)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Plaintiff Harry T. Davis. (Laule, Brian)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole Rae Wells for Plaintiff Harry T. Davis. (Wells, Nicole)
October 26, 2022 Filing 7 Reply to Counterclaim by Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.. (Lubinsky, Lori)
October 25, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Stephen)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against Harry T. Davis, COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Smith, Stephen) Modified on 10/25/2022. (lak)
October 21, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
October 20, 2022 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori) Modified on 10/21/2022: Answer filed in state court. (lak)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian F. Laule for Plaintiff Harry T. Davis. (Laule, Brian)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.. (Lubinsky, Lori)
September 26, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
September 26, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dunn County Circuit Court, case number 2022CV000018. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3128859), filed by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Order for Substitution of Party to Name Correct Defendant and to Amend Caption, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lubinsky, Lori) Modified on 9/27/2022: Corrected stats, added diversity of parties, added Diversity flag to docket sheet. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis, Harry et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry T Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry T. Davis
Represented By: Brian F. Laule
Represented By: Nicole Rae Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Incorporated, a fictitious entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?