Spertus v. Epic Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: John A. Spertus
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00553
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 63 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation (Loken, Bryce)
November 9, 2022 Filing 62 Redaction to #61 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendant John A. Spertus (Bui, Joanne)
November 9, 2022 Filing 61 Reply to Counterclaim (Sealed Document) by Counter Defendant John A. Spertus. (Bui, Joanne)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulated protective order is accepted and entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/28/2022. (jls)
October 28, 2022 Filing 59 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Loken, Bryce) Modified on 10/28/2022. (lak)
October 24, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Grace Colato Martinez and Robert M. Thompson withdrawn from the case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/21/2022. (jls)
October 21, 2022 Filing 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Robert M. Thompson and Grace Colato Martinez) by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. Response due 10/28/2022. (Loken, Bryce)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #55 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2022. (voc)
October 19, 2022 Filing 55 Motion to Seal Document #53 Answer, Counterclaim by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Noel, Kristin)
October 19, 2022 Filing 54 Redaction to #53 Answer, Counterclaim by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation (Noel, Kristin)
October 19, 2022 Filing 53 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Sealed Document), COUNTERCLAIM against John A. Spertus, by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation (Noel, Kristin) Modified on 10/20/2022. (lak)
October 19, 2022 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance filed by Lester A. Pines for Plaintiff John A. Spertus. (Pines, Lester)
October 19, 2022 Filing 51 Disregard. Modified on 10/19/2022. (lak)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Destiny L Bounds and Eric S. Johnson withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/13/2022. (jls)
October 13, 2022 Filing 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff John A. Spertus. Response due 10/20/2022. (Bui, Joanne)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #47 Motion to Admit Christin Cho Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2022. (lak)
October 11, 2022 Filing 47 Motion to Admit Christin Kyungsik Cho Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3138584.) by Plaintiff John A. Spertus. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Cho, Christin)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #45 Motion to Admit Joanne Bui Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/4/2022. (lak)
October 3, 2022 Filing 45 Motion to Admit Joanne Bui Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3134359.) by Plaintiff John A. Spertus. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Bui, Joanne)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Epic Systems Corporation answer due 10/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/2022. (jls)
September 30, 2022 Filing 43 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Loken, Bryce)
September 28, 2022 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristin Graham Noel for Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Noel, Kristin)
September 28, 2022 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:22-cv-00183. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
September 28, 2022 Case electronically transferred to District of Western District of Wisconsin. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kern, Kendra) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
September 28, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
September 28, 2022 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING #12 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; GRANTING motion to transfer case to the Western District of Wisconsin; DENYING AS MOOT #21 motion to stay. Signed on 9/21/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
September 21, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
September 19, 2022 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Loken, Bryce) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Martha Jahn Snyder terminated. Signed on 9/6/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)[Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Snyder, Martha) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 31, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Andrea M. Kimball(Loken, Bryce) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 35 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Andrea M. Kimball(Loken, Bryce) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #33 Joint MOTION to amend/correct: Discovery due by 1/2/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2023 02:00 PM via telephone conference before District Judge Greg Kays. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2023 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 8/19/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 10, 2022 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to amend/correct #30 Scheduling Order, (Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order) filed by Bryce Loken on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Loken, Bryce) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney A. Garrett Hutchinson for Epic Systems Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 31 Motion to allow A. Garrett Hutchinson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8051345) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2023 02:00 PM via telephone conference before District Judge Greg Kays. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2023 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 7/19/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed on 7/8/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Matthew J. Duchemin for Epic Systems Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. (Berner, Crystal)[Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
July 8, 2022 Filing 27 Motion to allow Matthew J. Duchemin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8007987) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #21 MOTION to stay filed by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryce A. Loken, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Snyder, Martha) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
June 15, 2022 Notice of Docket Modification. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/14/2022 as Document No. 24-1, Proposed Protective Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 25 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by John A. Spertus. (Bui, Joanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
June 14, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Entry of Protective Order by John A. Spertus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Bui, Joanne) Modified on 6/15/2022 please refer to docket modification. (Kern, Kendra) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
June 10, 2022 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #21 MOTION to stay filed by Joanne Bui on behalf of Plaintiff John A. Spertus. Reply suggestions due by 6/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Bui, Joanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 22 SUGGESTIONS in support re #21 MOTION to stay filed by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Snyder, Martha) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to stay filed by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/10/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Snyder, Martha) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or Transfer filed by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryce A. Loken, #2 Exhibit A - Article)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Snyder, Martha) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 and #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Martha Jahn Snyder and Bryce A. Loken for Epic Systems Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 18 Motion to allow Bryce A. Loken to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7944011) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 23, 2022 Filing 17 Motion to allow Martha Jahn Snyder to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7944001) filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or Transfer filed by Joanne Bui on behalf of Plaintiff John A. Spertus. Reply suggestions due by 5/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Dr. John Spertus, #2 Supplement Declaration of Joanne Bui, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Bui, Joanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendant's Motion to dismiss or transfer #12 . Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/13/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 4/27/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendant's Motion to dismiss or transfer filed by Joanne Bui on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/11/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bui, Joanne) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 25, 2022 Notice of Docket Modification. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 4/22/22 as Document Nos. 14 and 15, Supplements. The documents have been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the documents. The documents have been added as exhibits to Document 13. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or Transfer filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Thompson, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022: #1 Exhibit Declaration - Jamie Bjorklund, #2 Exhibit Declaration - Gretchen Bader, #3 Exhibit) (Strodtman, Tracy). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or Transfer filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendant Epic Systems Corporation.(Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation (Attorney Robert M. Thompson added to party Epic Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Thompson, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Grace Colato Martinez on behalf of Epic Systems Corporation (Attorney Grace Colato Martinez added to party Epic Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Martinez, Grace) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Joanne Bui for John A. Spertus allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 Motion to allow Joanne Bui to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7856571) filed by Eric S. Johnson on behalf of John A. Spertus. (Johnson, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 and #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christin Cho and Simon Franzini for John A. Spertus allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to allow Simon Franzini to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7852260) filed by Eric S. Johnson on behalf of John A. Spertus. (Johnson, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to allow Christin Cho to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7852247) filed by Eric S. Johnson on behalf of John A. Spertus. (Johnson, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Summons Issued as to Epic Systems Corporation. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Inclusion for Mediation and Assessment Program (MAP). (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 Remark - Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. A copy has been mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, DC 20559-6000 (Woods, Gloria)[Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial against Epic Systems Corporation filed by Eric S. Johnson on behalf of John A. Spertus. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7848991. Service due by 6/14/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 9/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spertus v. Epic Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Spertus
Represented By: Christin Cho
Represented By: Eric S. Johnson
Represented By: Joanne Bui
Represented By: Simon Franzini
Represented By: Destiny L Bounds
Represented By: Christin Kyungsik Cho
Represented By: Lester A. Pines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Represented By: A. Garrett Garrett Hutchinson
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Represented By: Bryce Loken
Represented By: Grace Colato Martinez
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Matthew J. Duchemin
Represented By: Adam Garrett Hutchinson
Represented By: Bryce Alexander Loken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?