Team Schierl Companies et al v. Aspirus, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Team Schierl Companies and Heartland Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Aspirus, Inc. and Aspirus Network, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00580
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting Motion to Admit Robert Berry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/28/2022. (lak)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to Admit Robert C.S. Berry Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3148280.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Berry, Robert)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' joint motion to extend defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond #15 is GRANTED. Defendant's new deadline is January 11, 2023. The parties' joint motion to allow 45/21 response/reply deadlines on any front-end motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs may request an extension of the standard 21-day response deadline after a dismissal motion actually has been filed, and they will have to make their case for why doubling the standard deadline is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/27/22. (jat)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Class Action Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule for Any Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Aspirus Network, Inc., Aspirus, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Splitek, Matthew)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Oesch for Defendants Aspirus Network, Inc., Aspirus, Inc. (Oesch, Nathan)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew J. Splitek for Defendants Aspirus Network, Inc., Aspirus, Inc. (Splitek, Matthew)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit James W. Crooks Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/26/2022. (lak)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corrected Motion to Admit James W Crooks Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3145351.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Crooks, James)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Disregard. Modified on 10/26/2022. (lak)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Leakhena Au for Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. (Au, Leakhena)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. All Defendants. (Burns, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Eric L. Cramer Pro Hac Vice; granting #3 Motion to Admit Abigail J. Gertner Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Admit Daniel J. Walker Pro ac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Admit Robert E. Litan Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2022. (lak)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aspirus Network, Inc., Aspirus, Inc. (lak)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to Admit Robert E. Litan Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3139257.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. (Litan, Robert)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion to Admit Daniel J Walker Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3139185.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. (Walker, Daniel)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion to Admit Abigail Gertner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3139166.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. (Gertner, Abigail)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Motion to Admit Eric Leon Cramer Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3139161.) by Plaintiffs Heartland Farms, Inc., Team Schierl Companies. (Cramer, Eric)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3138734.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Burns, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Team Schierl Companies et al v. Aspirus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Team Schierl Companies
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Timothy Wilson Burns
Represented By: Robert C.S. Berry
Represented By: Leakhena Au
Represented By: Abigail Gertner
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Eric Leon Cramer
Represented By: James W Crooks
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Timothy Wilson Burns
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Eric Leon Cramer
Represented By: James W Crooks
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Leakhena Au
Represented By: Robert C.S. Berry
Represented By: Abigail Gertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspirus, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Splitek
Represented By: Nathan Oesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspirus Network, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Splitek
Represented By: Nathan Oesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?