ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc. v. Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc. doing business as Unjury Protein
Defendant: Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00655
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Dispositive Motions due 1/12/2024. Settlement Letters due 4/26/2024. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 5/3/2024. Responses due 5/17/2024. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 02:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/10/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/10/2023. (rks)
January 9, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2023 [:10] (cak)
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Yarborough, Patrick)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent - Plaintiff, #2 Consent - Defendant) (lak)
December 14, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Todd Lowther for Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Lowther, Matthew)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #9 ). Brief in Opposition due 1/26/2023. Brief in Reply due 2/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/12/2022. (rks)
December 9, 2022 Filing 13 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 9) by Plaintiff ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Yarborough, Patrick) Modified on 12/9/2022. (lak)
December 7, 2022 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 12/16/2022. (lak)
December 7, 2022 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 Declaration of Tamara Vogel filed by Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. re: #9 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract) (Breen, Patrick)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Breen, Patrick)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 Brief in Support of #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Disregard) (Breen, Patrick) Modified on 12/6/2022: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
December 6, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 12/27/2022. Brief in Reply due 1/6/2023. (Breen, Patrick)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Breen for Defendant Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.. (Breen, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Marshal Hoda for Plaintiff ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc.. (Hoda, Marshal)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. (lak)
November 17, 2022 Filing 5 Disregard. Modified on 11/17/2022. (lak)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc.. (Yarborough, Patrick)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc. (lak)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Yarborough for Plaintiff ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc.. (Yarborough, Patrick)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3154772.), filed by ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Koby, James) Modified on 11/14/2022. (lak)
November 14, 2022 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
November 14, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc. v. Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProSynthesis Laboratories, Inc. doing business as Unjury Protein
Represented By: James Robert Koby
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurofins Microbiology Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Todd Lowther
Represented By: Patrick Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?