Bearson, Theresa et al v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Bearson and Gary Bearson
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP, Johnson Controls, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemdesign Products, Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 3:2022cv00724
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 14 Brief in Reply by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP in Support of #10 Motion to Stay, This Action Pending Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - NY2 Mot. to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Ridgewood Mot. to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Peshtigo Notice of Removal + Complaint) (Mette, Bryan)
January 24, 2023 Filing 13 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs Gary Bearson, Theresa Bearson in Support of #3 Motion to Remand to State Court, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order) (Shorts, Casey)
January 17, 2023 Filing 12 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP re: #3 Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Gary Bearson, Theresa Bearson (Mette, Bryan)
January 17, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Order and Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Gary Bearson, Theresa Bearson re: #10 Motion to Stay, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Orders - 19-CV-2123 & 19-CV-01022, #3 Exhibit C - Order - 19-CV-2198) (Shorts, Casey) Modified on 1/18/2023: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 Motion to Stay by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. Response due 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Order In re AFFF Prods. Liab. Litig. ECF No. 320, #2 Exhibit 2, Order In re AFFF Prods. Liab. Litig. ECF No. 325) (Mette, Bryan)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/4/2023. (rks)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiffs Gary Bearson, Theresa Bearson re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Tyco Fire Products LP (Shorts, Casey)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. (Mette, Bryan)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The December 28, 2022 answer/response deadline for defendants Tycho Fire Products, Johnson Controls and Chemguard is stayed until the court rules substantively on their request for an extension, to which plaintiffs have not yet responded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/28/2022. (voc)
December 28, 2022 Filing 5 Declaration of Bryan T. Mette filed by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP in Support of Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP, Johnson Controls, Inc., and Chemguard, Inc.'s re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time (Mette, Bryan)
December 28, 2022 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/4/2023. (Mette, Bryan)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO REMAND to State Court (With a Brief Attached) by Plaintiffs Gary Bearson, Theresa Bearson. Brief in Opposition due 1/17/2023. Brief in Reply due 1/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, Exhibit A and Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint) (Shorts, Casey) Modified on 12/27/2022: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Krueger for Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Krueger, Matthew)
December 22, 2022 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 22cv412. (lak)
December 22, 2022 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 22cv2969. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3171325), filed by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Record for Case No. 22cv2969 docket, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment [22cv2969]) (Mette, Bryan) Modified on 12/22/2022. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bearson, Theresa et al v. Tyco Fire Products LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Bearson
Represented By: Casey Paul Shorts
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bearson
Represented By: Casey Paul Shorts
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Bryan Theron Mette
Represented By: Matthew Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Theron Mette
Represented By: Matthew Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Theron Mette
Represented By: Matthew Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemdesign Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?