PFS Investments Inc. v. Thompson, Timothy
Plaintiff: PFS Investments Inc.
Defendant: Timothy Thompson
Case Number: 3:2023cv00050
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 Violation of Defend Trade Secrets Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Timothy Thompson dismissing this case without prejudice. (lam)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.'s motion for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/2/2023. (lam)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Response re: 36 Text Only Order,,, Response to Defendant's Supplemental Filing (Dkt. 37) Regarding Language for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NASD Notice to Members 02-07, #2 Exhibit B - Wamu Investments, Inc. v. Brandfors, et al., No. 09 2 08081 5 - TRO) (Harrison, Kendall)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Response re: 36 Text Only Order,,, Response to Plaintiff's Additional Analysis on DM Trans, LLC V. Scott and Irreparable Harm by Defendant Timothy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FINRA Rule 11870) (Alonso, Joseph)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Transcript of Injunctive Hearing, held 2/16/2023 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: PH. Please review the court's policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. (lam)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Response re: 36 Text Only Order,,, Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Harrison, Kendall)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Response re: 36 Text Only Order,,, Additional Analysis on DM Trans, LLC v. Scott and Irreparable Harm by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order, DM Trans, LLC v. Scott) (Harrison, Kendall)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Supplement to #24 Brief in Opposition, filed by Timothy Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FINRA Rule 2140, #2 Exhibit B - FINRA Rule 2273, #3 Exhibit C - FINRA Regulatory Notice 16-18, #4 Exhibit D - FINRA Regulatory Notice 19-10, #5 Exhibit E - FINRA Award 09-02224) (Alonso, Joseph) Modified on 2/21/2023: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff may have until Monday, February 20, 2023 to file with the court: (1) specific language of a proposed preliminary injunction, narrowed to the issues discussed at today's hearing; and (2) an analysis of the Seventh Circuit's decision in DM Trans, LLC v. Scott, 38 F.4th 608 (7th Cir. 2022), and in particular, the court of appeals' discussion of irreparable harm. Defendant may have until Monday, February 20, 2023 to file with the court proposed language that he wants included in any preliminary injunction, as well as legal support for his proposal. Both parties may have until Wednesday, February 22, 2023, to respond to each other's submissions. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/16/2023. (lam)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Injunctive Hearing held on 2/16/2023 re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PFS Investments Inc. [1:38] (Court Reporter FTR recording.) (jef)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #31 Motion to Admit Carson Leigh Wynn Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/15/2023. (lak)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - PFS Fin. Servs., Inc. & Primerica Fin. Servs., LLC v. Mitchell D. Stevens III, #2 Attachment 2 - Primerica Fin. Servs., Inc. v. Fallon et al., #3 Attachment 3 - Primerica Fin. Servs., Inc. v. John Bille, Gary Gordon and Jeffrey Lewis) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 2/14/2023. (lak)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. in Support of #3 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Merrill Lynch v. Akre & Baxter - Order and Motion Hearing Transcript) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 2/15/2023. (lak)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Motion to Admit Carson Leigh Wynn Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3197427.) by Defendant Timothy Thompson. (Wynn, Carson)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Deposition of Taylor Jesse Thompson taken on Jan. 6, 2023(Condensed Version of Dkt. 7). (Harrison, Kendall)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Deposition of Timothy Andrew Thompson taken on Jan. 4, 2023 (Condensed Version of Dkt. 6). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 - Tim Thompson 000073 - 91 (redacted)) (Harrison, Kendall)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply brief (dkt. #27 ) is GRANTED. The reply brief must be filed by February 14 at 12:00 pm, and must be limited to the two issues identified in plaintiff's motion. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/10/23. (jat)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Motion for Leave to File - Permission to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Harrison, Kendall)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Timothy Thompson filed by Defendant Timothy Thompson re: #3 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit September 22, 2022 Letter, #2 Exhibit CAFN 22-A01331 Gwinnett County Georgia Affidavit of Tim Thompson, #3 Exhibit FINRA Statement of Claim, #4 Exhibit Subpoena for Deposition and Documents) (Alonso, Joseph)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Timothy Thompson re: #3 Motion for TRO (Alonso, Joseph)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Timothy Thompson re: #3 Motion for TRO filed by PFS Investments Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Order UBS v. Kenney 22-cv-06917 Northern District of Illinois, #2 Exhibit B- FINRA Rule 2140, #3 Exhibit C- FINRA Regulatory Notice 16-18, #4 Exhibit D- FINRA Award 09-02224, #5 Exhibit E- FINRA Regulatory Notice 07-55) (Alonso, Joseph)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time (dkt. #21 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's brief in opposition to plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is extended to February 9, 2023. The court will hold a hearing on the motion on February 16, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/27/23. (jat)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #20 Motion to Admit Joseph B. Alonso Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/27/2023. (lak)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and to Postpone the Hearing on Said Motion by Defendant Timothy Thompson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Alonso, Joseph)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to Admit Joseph Alonso Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3187039.) by Defendant Timothy Thompson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Alonso, Joseph)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #18 Motion to Admit Matthew I. Penfield Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/25/2023. (lak)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Motion to Admit Matthew Penfield Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3185732.) by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Penfield, Matthew)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #16 Stipulated Motion Concerning the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/23/23. (jat)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulated Motion Concerning the Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Harrison, Kendall)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Timothy Thompson. (lak)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. #Procedure to be followed on Motions for Injunctive Relief attached. Brief in Opposition due 1/30/2023. Injunctive Hearing set for 2/2/2023 at 10:00 AM. (jat)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Rule 65 Certification. (Harrison, Kendall)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Declaration of Kimberly Geiger filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POL License and Use Agreement) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Affidavit of Kristopher Lee Kowalski filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of Mark Heim filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of Donna Travis filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Declaration of Sheri Morgan filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Declaration of Robert H. Peterman filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compensation Reports, #2 Exhibit B - Basic Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - RVP Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Registered Representative Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Operating Guideline, #6 Exhibit F - Termination Letters) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Caption? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Deposition of Taylor Jesse Thompson taken on Jan. 6, 2023. (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Condensed format? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Deposition of Timothy Andrew Thompson taken on Jan. 4, 2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Tim Thompson 000073-91 (redacted)) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/21/2023: Condensed format? (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. re: #3 Motion for TRO (Harrison, Kendall)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charnot - Agreed Order of Permanent Injunction, #2 Exhibit Chussler Order - Jan. 1996 - Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Experior, Arturi, DeLio and Dubeau - Permanent_Injunction, #4 Exhibit PFS v. Bustos - Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit PFS v. Cortez Lee - TRO, #6 Exhibit PFS v. Dan Brandfast - Restr. Order, #7 Exhibit PFS v. Herring and Fulcher - Preliminary Injunction, #8 Exhibit PFS v. Jernigan - Preliminary Injunction, #9 Exhibit PFS v. King, Ballard, Phillips - Restraining Order, #10 Exhibit PFS v. Palmer - Preliminary Injunction, #11 Exhibit Roe, Bettenhausen & DeMarco - Agreed Order of Permanent Injunction, #12 Exhibit PFS v. Hibbs - Stipulated Injunction, #13 Exhibit PFS v. Weihrauch - Stipulated Permanent Injunction) (Harrison, Kendall)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Harrison, Kendall)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Timothy Thompson. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5263096.), filed by PFS Investments Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Basic Agreement with PFS, #2 Exhibit B - RVP Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Registered Representative Agreement, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Harrison, Kendall) Modified on 1/20/2023: County. (lak)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff PFS Investments Inc.. (Harrison, Kendall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PFS Investments Inc. v. Thompson, Timothy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFS Investments Inc.
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Matthew Penfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Thompson
Represented By: Joseph Alonso
Represented By: Carson Leigh Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?