Bausch, Kristin v. Frost, Jacob et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Bausch
Defendant: Jacob Frost, Jason Hanson, Emily Wilson, Jane Jacobs, Lisa Bina, Nancy Haack, Jennifer Cooke and Criscilda Chairez
Case Number: 3:2023cv00061
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 17 Declaration of Jennifer R. Remington filed by Defendant Jacob Frost re: #15 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1000 - Dane County 21FA822 Case Details) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps)
March 21, 2023 Filing 16 Brief in Support of #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Jacob Frost (Remington, Jennifer),(ps)
March 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Jacob Frost. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps)
March 21, 2023 Set Deadlines as to Defendant Jacob Frost's #15 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 4/11/2023. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 4/21/2023. (jef),(ps)
March 13, 2023 Set Deadlines as to Defendant Emily Wilson's #11 MOTION TO DISMISS Claim Against Defendant Emily Wilson. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 4/3/2023. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 4/13/2023. (jef),(ps)
March 8, 2023 Filing 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Jacob Frost. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps)
March 7, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Service by Defendant Emily Wilson as to #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION TO DISMISS Claim Against Defendant Emily Wilson. (Crooks, Michael),(ps)
March 7, 2023 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss Claim Against Defendant Emily Wilson by Defendant Emily Wilson (Crooks, Michael),(ps)
March 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS Claim Against Defendant Emily Wilson by Defendant Emily Wilson. (Crooks, Michael),(ps)
March 7, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Renee Remington for Defendant Jacob Frost. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps)
March 2, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Service by Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs. (Mullen, Melita),(ps)
March 1, 2023 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs (Mullen, Melita),(ps)
March 1, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs. (Mullen, Melita),(ps)
March 1, 2023 Set Deadlines as to Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs's #7 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 3/23/2023. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 4/3/2023. (jef),(ps)
February 20, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Melita M. Mullen for Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs. (Mullen, Melita),(ps)
February 20, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Sheila M. Sullivan for Defendants Lisa Bina, Criscilda Chairez, Jennifer Cooke, Nancy Haack, Jason Hanson, Jane Jacobs. (Sullivan, Sheila),(ps)
February 8, 2023 Filing 4 Notice and Request for Injunction by Plaintiff Kristin Bausch. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Judicial Notice Due Process Error, 2021FA922, #3 Exhibit A - UNC Blog New Regulations Regarding Contempt in IV-D Child Support Cases) (jef),(ps)
February 8, 2023 Filing 3 Summons as to the State of Wisconsin by Plaintiff Kristin Bausch. (jef),(ps)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summonses issued as to Jacob Frost et al. Mailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Jason Hanson, #2 Emily Wilson, #3 Jane Jacobs, #4 Lisa Bina, #5 Nancy Haack, #6 Jennifer Cooke, #7 Criscilda Chairez, #8 Procedure for serving individuals in a federal lawsuit, #9 Clerk's office cover letter) (jef),(ps)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kristin Bausch. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Summons as to All Defendants, State of Wisconsin, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet.) (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 483.) (lam),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bausch, Kristin v. Frost, Jacob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Bausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Frost
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hanson
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Wilson
Represented By: Michael Patrick Crooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Jacobs
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bina
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Haack
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cooke
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criscilda Chairez
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?