The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG et al
Plaintiff: Delong Co., Inc.
Defendant: Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc. and Syngenta Seeds, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00321
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. (nln)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On June 28, 2023, the court offered the parties ten different trial dates over a 2 month span. On July 7, 2023, the parties rejected them all, suggesting instead a June 10, 2024 start for a shorter (three week) trial. The court will place this lawsuit on its June 10, 2024 trial calendar in a subordinate position behind Case No. 22-cv-690, which already is scheduled to start on June 10, 2024. Here is the schedule: ex parte settlement letters are due to the Clerk of Court by April 19, 2024. Submissions for the final pretrial conference are due April 26, 2024, with responses due by May 10, 2024. The court will hold a final pretrial conference on May 29, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. A follow-up final pretrial conference is scheduled for June 5, 2024 at 2:30, which will be canceled if the court and the parties finish all necessary tasks on May 29. Jury selection and trial will begin June 10, 2024 at 9:00 a.m., in second position behind Case No. 22-cv-690. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/10/2023. (jef)
July 7, 2023 Filing 200 Response re: 199 Text Only Order. Joint Report Regarding Trial Dates by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Horowitz, David) Modified on 7/10/2023. (lak)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** At a June 28, 2023, telephonic status conference, the court advised the parties that it can try this case starting at 9:00 a.m. on any of these dates, all in 2024: March 18, 25, April 1, 8, 15, 29, May 6, 13, 20, June 3. Not later than July 7, 2023, the parties must jointly report which of these trial dates they have chosen. If they cannot agree on a date, they should so report, and the court will choose one of these dates for them. The court then will set the remaining dates and deadlines leading toward the chosen trial date. The presiding judge will hold a telephonic status conference on August 17, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. His primary agenda item is to clarify and pare down defendant's defenses set forth in Section III.B. of the June 23, 2023 Joint Pretrial Report, dkt. #198 , at 4-7. Not later than August 3, 2023, the parties are to submit a joint report that tersely sets forth areas of agreement, areas of dispute, and which disputes require court action. If there are other topics on which early court input and direction will streamline what happens next, then the parties may broach them in headline fashion in their August 3, 2023 report. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/28/2023. (rks)
June 28, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2023 [:10] (cak)
June 23, 2023 Filing 198 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pretrial Order from Kansas MDL Court) (Chaney, William)
June 12, 2023 Filing 197 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Horowitz, David)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #195 Motion to Admit Scott A. Powell Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/12/2023. (jef)
June 12, 2023 Filing 195 Motion to Admit Scott A. Powell Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3257455.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Powell, Scott)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #193 Motion to Admit David I. Horowitz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/6/2023. (lak)
June 5, 2023 Filing 193 Motion to Admit David I. Horowitz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3254419.) by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Horowitz, David)
June 5, 2023 Action Requested as to Defendants: Please file a #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jef)
June 1, 2023 Filing 192 MDL No. 2591 List of Stipulated Documents for Remand from #District of Kansas. (jat)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #190 Motion to Admit Edwin U Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/1/2023. (lak)
May 31, 2023 Filing 190 Motion to Admit Edwin J. U. Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3250930.) by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (U., Edwin)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #188 Motion to Admit Don M. Downing Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/30/2023. (lak)
May 30, 2023 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jef)
May 26, 2023 Filing 188 Motion to Admit Don M. Downing Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3249424.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Downing, Don)
May 23, 2023 Filing 187 Notice of Appearance filed by Jerry M. Santangelo for Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Santangelo, Jerry)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #181 Motion to Admit William B. Chaney Pro Hac Vice; granting #182 Motion to Admit William N. Drabble Pro Hac Vice; granting #183 Motion to Admit Andrew K. York Pro Hac Vice; granting #184 Motion to Admit London England Pro Hac Vice; granting #185 Motion to Admit Skyler Y. Stuckey Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/18/2023. (lak)
May 17, 2023 Filing 185 Motion to Admit Skyler Stuckey Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number BWIWDC-3244659.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Stuckey, Skyler)
May 17, 2023 Filing 184 Motion to Admit London England Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3244642.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (England, London)
May 17, 2023 Filing 183 Motion to Admit Andrew K. York Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3244640.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (York, Andrew)
May 17, 2023 Filing 182 Motion to Admit William Nelson Drabble Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3244624.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Drabble, William)
May 17, 2023 Filing 181 Motion to Admit William B. Chaney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3244595.) by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc.. (Chaney, William)
May 16, 2023 Filing 180 Additional Documents from MDL. (Attachments: #1 Additional Documents from MDL) (lak)
May 16, 2023 Case directly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Previous case 17-cv-778. (lak)
May 15, 2023 Filing 179 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:17-cv-02614. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
May 15, 2023 Case transferred to District of Western District of Wisconsin per #177 Conditional Remand Order. Civil Case Terminated. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
May 12, 2023 Filing 178 NOTICE of Letter from William B. Chaney to Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas by Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2023: #1 Corrected Letter and Attachment) (lak).
April 4, 2023 Filing 177 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. Parties shall furnish the Clerk of the District of Kansas with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded by May 12, 2023. Please see the order for additional details. Signed by deputy clerk on 04/04/2023. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 176 LETTER from William B. Chaney re: #175 Order of Suggestion. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Suggesting to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation That This Case Be Remanded to the Transferor Court. Please see the order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/23/2023. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 23, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A copy of the Order #175 was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on today's date. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Upon remand, the case comes before the Court on Syngenta's motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 106), specifically the bases asserted by Syngenta for summary judgment that the Court declined to address in its previous summary judgment order. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 106) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to DeLong's claim of negligence with respect to defendants' commercialization of Duracade, and judgment is awarded to defendants on that claim. The motion is otherwise denied. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 90) is granted in part and denied in part. (Please see order for details.) Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on February 28, 2023. (mls) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER terminating referral to magistrate judge. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/23/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #170 Motion to Supplement. Please see the order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/13/2023. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 16, 2022 Filing 172 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #170 Motion to Supplement, (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 171 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Delong Co., Inc. re #170 Motion to Supplement, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Filing 170 MOTION to Supplement (Motion for Targeted Supplemental Discovery Relevant to Its Statute of Limitations Defense) by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held 6/29/2022 before Judge John W Lungstrum, Court Reporter Nancy Wiss, 913-735-2354, nancy_wiss@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Jennifer Wieland of Berkowitz Oliver Firm. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2023. (nw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 29, 2022 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held 6/8/2022 before Judge John W Lungstrum, Court Reporter Nancy Wiss, 913-735-2354, nancy_wiss@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Jennifer Wieland of Berkowitz Oliver Firm. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2023. (nw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER. The Court orders that if any party wishes to conduct additional discovery or to supplement its summary judgment briefing, it should, after conferring with opposing counsel, file a motion seeking appropriate relief on or before December 2, 2022. If such a motion is filed, any response shall be due on December 9, 2022, and any reply shall be due on December 16, 2022. Please see the order for further detail. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/21/2022. (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - Today the undersigned magistrate judge conducted a settlement conference. The parties were not able to reach a settlement. The case is ready for the presiding U.S. District Judge, John W. Lungstrum, to rule on defendant's summary-judgment motion with regard to issues other than the statute of limitations (see ECF No. 106; see also ECF No. 144 at 1 fn. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/15/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(O'Hara, James) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Filing 165 NOTICE OF COURTROOM ASSIGNMENT. Settlement Hearing set for November 15, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 643 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (yh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 164 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) By agreement of the parties, the Settlement Conference is rescheduled for 11/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown)before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The courtroom deputy will reach out with a courtroom location closer to the mediation date. (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Filing 163 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Patrick Haney as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 SETTLEMENT-CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/18/22. (yh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 14, 2022 Filing 161 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (yh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 12, 2022 Filing 160 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/29/22. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 159 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/29/2022 at 3:00 PM (Central) by Telephone before Judge John W. Lungstrum. All parties joining in the conference should dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and use ACCESS CODE 2126821. (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 8, 2022 Filing 158 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/8/2022. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 7, 2022 Filing 157 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 3:00 PM by Telephone JWL - All parties participating in the conference are to dial the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and use ACCESS CODE 2126821. (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 6, 2022 Filing 156 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: REVERSING and REMANDING to the District Court. (Appeal No. 21-3044) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(heo) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Marcy Blattner as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 154 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Michael A. Onufer as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 153 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #148 Notice of Appeal ( Appeal No. 21-3044). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by The Delong Co., Inc. (Originally filed with 10CCA on 3/18/2021) re #148 Notice of Appeal. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 151 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Copies of Expert Reports by The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted 1, #2 Exhibit - Redacted 2, #3 Exhibit - Redacted 3)(Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 150 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 3/5/2021 and assigned Appeal No. 21-3044 re #148 Notice of Appeal filed by The Delong Co., Inc. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 149 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #148 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 4, 2021 Filing 148 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5428223. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER (relates ONLY to case no: 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO, The DeLong Co, Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.,) - granting (146) DeLong's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Keep Documents Under Seal and to Re-File Documents in Redacted Form. (See order for details) Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/01/2021. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Keep Certain Documents Under Seal and to Re-File Certain Documents in Redacted Form by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 22, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #146 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Keep Certain Documents Under Seal and to Re-File Certain Documents in Redacted Form . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 22, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #146 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Keep Certain Documents Under Seal and to Re-File Certain Documents in Redacted Form. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 145 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/3/2021. (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (relates to case 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO) granting (106) Defendants' Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment and defendants are awarded judgment on plaintiff's claims. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/03/2021. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Joint Motion Regarding Sealed Documents. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/01/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 142 Joint MOTION Regarding Sealed Documents by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (York, Andrew) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 141 CONVENTIONALLY FILED DVD EXHIBIT (Sealed Exhibits 130-137) IN SUPPORT of #138 SEALED Document, #139 Affidavit, #140 SEALED Exhibits, received in KC Clerk's Office 12/28/2020. One copy maintained in the clerk's office vault with a copy given to JWL Chambers. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 140 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) - Exhibits 129-150 and 152 to Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment re #139 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 130, #2 Exhibit 131, #3 Exhibit 132, #4 Exhibit 133, #5 Exhibit 134, #6 Exhibit 135, #7 Exhibit 136, #8 Exhibit 137, #9 Exhibit 138, #10 Exhibit 139, #11 Exhibit 140, #12 Exhibit 141, #13 Exhibit 142, #14 Exhibit 143, #15 Exhibit 144, #16 Exhibit 145, #17 Exhibit 146, #18 Exhibit 147, #19 Exhibit 148, #20 Exhibit 149, #21 Exhibit 150, #22 Exhibit 152)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw)[Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment re #138 SEALED Document by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 128, #2 Exhibit 151, #3 Exhibit 153)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 138 SEALED DOCUMENT Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment re #106 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 137 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin Carter re #136 SEALED Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 136 SEALED DOCUMENT Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin Carter re #101 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin A. Carter (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 135 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) (Exhibits 9-19) to Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall re #134 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall re #133 SEALED Document, by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 133 SEALED DOCUMENT Syngenta's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall re #98 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 132 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull re #103 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull (Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 131 SEALED DOCUMENT Delongs Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony, of Quentin L. Mimms re #92 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms (Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 130 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 129 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiffs Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Christian H. Krupke re #96 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, Ph.D. (Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 128 SEALED DOCUMENT Delongs Notice of Errata to Correct Clerical Errors Associated With Exhibit 1 to its Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (relates to 17-2614, DeLong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al,) granting (93) Sealed Motion in case 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Randal Giroux and plaintiff will not be permitted at trial to offer expert testimony by Mr. Giroux pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 12/11/2020. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 126 SEALED DOCUMENT - Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Opposition to DeLong's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #125 SEALED Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67, #8 Exhibit 68, #9 Exhibit 69, #10 Exhibit 70, #11 Exhibit 71, #12 Exhibit 72, #13 Exhibit 73, #14 Exhibit 74, #15 Exhibit 75, #16 Exhibit 76, #17 Exhibit 77, #18 Exhibit 78, #19 Exhibit 79, #20 Exhibit 80, #21 Exhibit 81, #22 Exhibit 82, #23 Exhibit 83, #24 Exhibit 84, #25 Exhibit 85, #26 Exhibit 86, #27 Exhibit 87, #28 Exhibit 88, #29 Exhibit 89, #30 Exhibit 90, #31 Exhibit 91, #32 Exhibit 92, #33 Exhibit 93, #34 Exhibit 94, #35 Exhibit 95, #36 Exhibit 96, #37 Exhibit 97, #38 Exhibit 98, #39 Exhibit 99, #40 Exhibit 100, #41 Exhibit 101, #42 Exhibit 102, #43 Exhibit 103, #44 Exhibit 104, #45 Exhibit 105, #46 Exhibit 106, #47 Exhibit 107, #48 Exhibit 108, #49 Exhibit 109, #50 Exhibit 110, #51 Exhibit 111, #52 Exhibit 112, #53 Exhibit 113, #54 Exhibit 114, #55 Exhibit 115, #56 Exhibit 116, #57 Exhibit 117, #58 Exhibit 118, #59 Exhibit 119, #60 Exhibit 120, #61 Exhibit 121, #62 Exhibit 122, #63 Exhibit 123, #64 Exhibit 124, #65 Exhibit 125, #66 Exhibit 126, #67 Exhibit 127)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 125 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #90 Motion for Summary Judgment (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 124 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re #106 SEALED MOTION Syngenta's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Appendix, #29 Stuckey Declaration)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT (Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to DeLong's Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms re #122 SEALED Response to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 122 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #92 Motion to Exclude Certain Reports of the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 121 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re #98 SEALED MOTION, to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 120 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re #101 SEALED MOTION, to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin Carter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 119 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) Exhibits C-M and P to Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to DeLong's Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, PH.D. re #118 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit P)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of (Declaration) of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Delong's Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, PH.D re #117 SEALED Response to Motion by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit O)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 117 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #96 Motion to Exclude (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 116 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) - Exhibits D and E to Declaration of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Philip A. Shull re #115 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Philip A. Shull re #114 SEALED Response to Motion by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 114 SEALED RESPONSE by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #103 Motion to Exclude (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Randal Giroux re #112 Reply to Response to Motion by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 112 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #93 SEALED MOTION (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 111 CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBIT 5 IN SUPPORT of #101 SEALED MOTION; EXHIBITS 28 AND 42 IN SUPPORT of #106 SEALED MOTION. Original will be maintained in the clerk's office vault and a copy was provided to Judge Lungstrum's chambers. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 110 CONVENTIONALLY FILED SEALED EXHIBIT 11 IN SUPPORT of #94 SEALED Memorandum in Support of Motion. Original will be maintained in the clerk's office vault and a copy was provided to Judge Lungstrum's chambers. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 109 SEALED RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re #93 SEALED MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Andrew K. York, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 2, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #93 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Randal Giroux, #98 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall, #103 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull, #96 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, Ph.D., #92 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms, #101 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin A. Carter, #106 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 108 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Motion re #106 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11 - Part 1, #15 Exhibit 11 - Part 2, #16 Exhibit 11 - Part 3, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Exhibit 36, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47, #53 Exhibit 48, #54 Exhibit 49, #55 Exhibit 50, #56 Exhibit 51, #57 Exhibit 52, #58 Exhibit 53, #59 Exhibit 54, #60 Exhibit 55, #61 Exhibit 56, #62 Exhibit 57, #63 Exhibit 58, #64 Exhibit 59, #65 Exhibit 60)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 107 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #106 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 106 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 105 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Motion re #101 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin A. Carter by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 104 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #103 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Philip A. Shull by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 102 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #101 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin A. Carter by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 101 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Colin A. Carter by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 100 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer B. Wieland in Support of Syngenta's Motion re #98 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 99 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #98 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 98 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Joseph Keaschall by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 97 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #96 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, Ph.D. by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Christian H. Krupke, Ph.D. by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 95 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #93 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Randal Giroux by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC(Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 94 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #92 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; certain document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 93 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Opinions of Randal Giroux by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of Expert Report and Opinions, and Limit Testimony of Quentin L. Mimms by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 91 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #90 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16-Part 1, #4 Exhibit 16-Part 2, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 20, #9 Exhibit 21, #10 Exhibit 22, #11 Exhibit 23, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26, #15 Exhibit 27, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 29, #18 Exhibit 31, #19 Exhibit 35, #20 Exhibit 36, #21 Exhibit 39, #22 Exhibit 40, #23 Exhibit 41, #24 Exhibit 42, #25 Exhibit 43, #26 Exhibit 44, #27 Exhibit 45, #28 Exhibit 46, #29 Exhibit 47, #30 Exhibit 48, #31 Exhibit 49, #32 Exhibit 50, #33 Exhibit 51, #34 Exhibit 52, #35 Exhibit 53, #36 Exhibit 54, #37 Exhibit 60, #38 Exhibit 61, #39 Exhibit 62, #40 Exhibit 63, #41 Exhibit 64, #42 Exhibit 101, #43 Exhibit 102, #44 Exhibit 103, #45 Exhibit 104, #46 Exhibit 105, #47 Exhibit 106, #48 Exhibit 107, #49 Exhibit 108, #50 Exhibit 109, #51 Exhibit 110, #52 Exhibit 111)(Chaney, William) Modified on 3/2/2021; document(s) unsealed pursuant to Order #147 . (gw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER (relates to case 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO ONLY): granting (88) Parties Joint Motion for Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Schedule. Syngenta's deadline to file the Giroux Motion is extended until October 30, 2020; DeLong's opposition shall be due by November 6, 2020; and Syngenta's reply shall be due by November 12, 2020. The deadline for the Parties to file summary judgment and Daubert Motions (apart from the Giroux Motion) shall be extended until October 30, 2020; with any oppositions to be filed by December 2, 2020; and any replies to be filed by December 23, 2020. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/21/2020. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 21, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #88 Joint MOTION for extension of time Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Schedule. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 88 Joint MOTION for extension of time Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Schedule by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/16/2020. (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER re #74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 10/9/20 in the District of MN 20-00064). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 85 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION re: #79 Motion to Transfer Case (Originally filed on 10/5/20 in the District of MN 20-00064). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 84 Second Declaration of Kathryn N. Hibbard in Support of #74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 9/28/20 in the District of MN 20-00064).(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #79 MOTION to Transfer Case and REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #74 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. (Originally filed on 9/28/20 in the District of MN 20-00064).(hw) Modified on 10/16/2020 to correct title (ca). [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 82 Meet and Confer Statement (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 81 Declaration of David I. Horowitz in Support of #79 MOTION to Transfer Case (Originally filed on 9/18/20 in the District of MN 20-00064).(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #79 MOTION to Transfer Case and MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION of #74 MOTION to Quash Subpoena. (Originally filed on 9/18/20 in the District of MN 20-00064).(hw) Modified on 10/16/2020 to correct title (ca). [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION to Transfer Case (Originally filed on 9/18/20 in the District of MN 20-00064). (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 78 Meet and Confer Statement (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064) (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 77 Declaration of Kathryn N. Hibbard in Support of #74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064)(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 76 Declaration of Randal Giroux in Support of #74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064).(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064)(hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION to Quash (Originally filed on 9/11/20 in the District of MN 20-00064) (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED in The DeLong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al., in 17-2614, estimated trial time 15-20 days; Dispositive motion deadline 10/27/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL/KHV) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/7/2020. (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 72 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Skyler Stuckey on behalf of The Delong Co., Inc. (Stuckey, Skyler) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 71 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/29/2020. (AT&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 01:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference.(ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 69 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Rachel E. Schwartz on behalf of The Delong Co., Inc. (Schwartz, Rachel) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 1:30 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The court may convert the pretrial conference to a telephone conference after reviewing the proposed pretrial order. The proposed pretrial order remains due September 17, 2020. (ss) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying #63 motion to strike expert disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/4/2020. (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 66 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #63 Motion to Compel Discovery or to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures of Randal Giroux and Joseph Keaschall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of David I. Horowitz in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re: #63 Motion to Compel Discovery or to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures of Randal Giroux and Joseph Keaschall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of of David I. Horowitz in Support of Syngenta's #63 Motion to Compel Discovery or to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures of Randal Giroux and Joseph Keaschall re: #63 MOTION to Compel Discovery or to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures of Randal Giroux and Joseph Keaschall by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Compel Discovery or to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures of Randal Giroux and Joseph Keaschall by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 consent motion to set briefing schedule for Syngenta's anticipated motion regarding DeLong's expert disclosures. Syngenta shall file its motion by August 20, 2020, and Syngenta's opening brief shall be limited to eight double-spaced pages. DeLong shall file its opposition to Syngenta's motion by August 27, 2020, and DeLong's opposition brief shall be limited to eight double-spaced pages. Syngenta shall file its reply to DeLong's opposition by September 1, 2020, and Syngenta's reply brief shall be limited to four double-spaced pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 61 Consent MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule Regarding Delong's Expert Disclosures by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 60 JOINT WAIVER of Lexecon Rights by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 consent motion to extend Lexecon waiver deadline to July 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/30/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 58 Consent MOTION to Extend Lexecon Waiver Deadline by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Plaintiff The DeLong Co., Inc., for the following: Chris DeLong (June 18, 2020), Derek Abbas (June 19, 2020), and William Charles "Bo" DeLong (June 22, 2020); and Notice of Videotaped Depositions for the following: Cathy Chrislaw (June 16, 2020); William Charles "Bo" DeLong (June 23, 2020); and Gabrael Burke (June 25, 2020); and David DeLong (June 25, 2020) by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 6/30/2020. Dispositive motion deadline 10/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/5/20. (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION Regarding Protocol For Conducting Remote Depositions by The Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 5, 2020 Filing 54 Consent MOTION to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Scheduling Deadlines by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: granting #52 unopposed motion to amend scheduling order. Discovery deadline 6/15/2020. Dispositive motion deadline 10/23/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/9/2020. (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 52 Consent MOTION to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Scheduling Deadlines by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery deadline 4/3/2020. Dispositive motion deadline 10/23/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2020. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 440 (JWL/KHV) before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/11/2020. (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta's Notice of Videotaped Depositions for the following: Austin DeLong (March 10, 2020); Deborah Koester (March 10, 2020); Tim Lange (March 11, 2020); Drew McClymont (March 12, 2020); Gabrael Burke (March 18, 2020); Cathy Chrislaw (March 19, 2020); William Charles "Bo" DeLong (Individual) (March 25, 2020); and David DeLong (April 2, 2020); and Syngenta's Notice of Videotaped Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Plaintiff The DeLong Co., Inc. for the following: Chris DeLong (March 20, 2020); and William Charles "Bo" DeLong (March 24, 2020) by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 consent motion to extend certain pre-trial deadlines. For good cause shown, the court enters the parties' proposed amended scheduling order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/24/20. (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta's Notice of Videotaped Depositions of Brandon Bickman, February 26, 2020; Brian Arnold, February 28, 2020; Deborah Koester, March 5, 2020; David DeLong, March 6, 2020; and Austin DeLong, March 10, 2020 by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 47 Consent MOTION to Extend Certain Pre-Trial Scheduling Deadlines by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta AG's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production to The DeLong Co., Inc. by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 consent motion for extension of time until March 20, 2020, for the parties to file a joint Lexecon waiver of their right to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 44 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Parties to File Joint Lexecon Waiver by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 43 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marcy Blattner on behalf of Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Blattner, Marcy) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 42 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alexander Onufer on behalf of Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Onufer, Michael) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Notice of Videotaped Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions to The Delong Co., Inc. (Gabe Burke, January 29, 2020; Derek Abbas, January 30, 2020; Brian Arnold, February 4, 2020; Joe Taft, February 7, 2020; Bo DeLong, February 11-12, 2020; and Chris DeLong, March 3, 2020), and Notice of Videotaped Deposition of Joe Taft (February 6, 2020) by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta Crop Protection's Second Set of Interrogatories to The Delong Co., Inc., by Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) Modified filer name on 1/22/2020. (smc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 39 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William Nelson Drabble on behalf of The Delong Co., Inc. (Drabble, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 38 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by London England on behalf of The Delong Co., Inc. (England, London) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 consent motion to extend time. Syngenta shall file any motion to compel DeLong's responses to Syngenta's first set of requests for production and first set of interrogatories by January 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Syngenta to File a Motion to Compel Discovery Responses From the DeLong Company, Inc. by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 consent motion for extension of the fact-discovery deadline to March 13, 2020. All other deadlines in the scheduling order (ECF No. #11 ) remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 34 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline for Fact Discovery by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 consent motion to extend time. Syngenta shall file any motion to compel DeLong's responses to Syngenta's first set of requests for production and first set of interrogatories by January 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Syngenta to File a Motion to Compel Discovery Responses From The Delong Company, Inc. by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta's Notice of Videotaped Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition to Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 consent motion to extend time. Syngenta shall file any motion to compel DeLong's responses to Syngenta's first set of requests for production and first set of interrogatories by December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 Consent MOTION to Extend Time for Syngenta to File a Motion to Compel Discovery Responses From the Delong Company, Inc. by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara.) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Syngenta's Identificaton of Persons and Entities for Comparison of Fault by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #11 Scheduling Order,, (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 Syngenta's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC.(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories to the Delong Co., Inc. by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 unopposed motion for extension of time until September 23, 2019, for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ((Relates to 17-2614; The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG, et al.) - granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (12) in case 2:17-cv-02614-JWL-JPO. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/26/2019. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 SURREPLY by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a sur-reply to #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff should cause that brief to be filed forthwith. In addition, in accordance with the Court's usual practice of allowing the movant the last word, the Court will also consider the arguments addressed to the merits that defendants included at pages 5-6 of their opposition to the instant motion for leave. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/20/2019. (ses) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re #19 MOTION for Leave to file a Surreply in Opposition to Syngenta's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #19 MOTION for Leave to file a Surreply in Opposition to Syngenta's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to file a Surreply in Opposition to Syngenta's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Surreply in Opposition to Syngenta's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint)(Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER amending #11 scheduling order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/10/19. (jc) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Syngenta's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff The DeLong Co., Inc.'s Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by The Delong Co., Inc.. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC(Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC (Schult, Thomas) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery deadline 2/14/2020. Dispositive motion deadline 7/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in KC Courtroom 440 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/4/2019. (amh) **Regenerated on 6/4/2019 per chambers. (mg)** [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Syngenta AG, Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Syngenta Crop Protection AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, Syngenta Seeds, LLC. (Wieland, Jennifer) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Intent to Proceed With Individual Lawsuit by The Delong Co., Inc. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William B. Chaney on behalf of The Delong Co., Inc.. (Chaney, William) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00778. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/23/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 10/23/2017. (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 17, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Delong Co., Inc. (Moore, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 3 Disregard. This form is blank. Modified on 10/17/2017. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Syngenta AG. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Crop Protection AG, #2 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Corporation, #3 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, #4 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., #5 Summons Issued as to Syngenta Seeds, LLC) (kwf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 265C4NP3.), filed by The Delong Co., Inc., (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Syngenta AG, #3 Summons - Syngenta Crop Protection AG, #4 Summons - Syngenta Corporation, #5 Summons - Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, #6 Summons - Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc., #7 Summons - Syngenta Seeds, LLC) (Moore, David) Modified on 10/12/2017: Jury trial demanded in the complaint but not on the Civil Cover Sheet. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 10/23/2017.] [Transferred from Kansas on 5/15/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Delong Co., Inc. v. Syngenta AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delong Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew K. York
Represented By: David Charles Moore
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Jerry Santangelo
Represented By: London England
Represented By: Patrick J. Stueve
Represented By: Rachel E. Schwartz
Represented By: Scott A. Powell
Represented By: Skyler Stuckey
Represented By: William B. Chaney
Represented By: William Nelson Drabble
Represented By: Jerry M. Santangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta AG
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection LLC
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Seeds, LLC
Represented By: David I. Horowitz
Represented By: Edwin J. U.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Leslie M. Smith
Represented By: Patrick T. Haney
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Represented By: Marcy Blattner
Represented By: Michael Alexander Onufer
Represented By: David G. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?