Anderson v. Discovery Media Co et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Jacob Anderson
Defendant: Discovery Media Co, Brent Waak, Mark Biller and You Tube Media
Case Number: 3:2023cv00392
Filed: June 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Jesse Jacob Anderson's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is GRANTED. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 6/12/2023. (nln),(ps)
June 12, 2023 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:23-cv-01135. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
June 12, 2023 Judge update in case. Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER this action to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 6/6/2023. (MSK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/12/2023.]
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 23-cv-1135 JWB/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Jerry W. Blackwell on 5/8/2023.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/12/2023.]
April 20, 2023 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jesse Jacob Anderson. (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/16/2023 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/12/2023.] Modified on 6/12/2023 (nln).
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Biller, Discovery Media Co, Brent Waak, You Tube Media filed by Jesse Jacob Anderson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/16/2023 (JGK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/12/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Discovery Media Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Jacob Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Media Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Waak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: You Tube Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?