Illinois Casualty Company v. Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Illinois Casualty Company
Defendant: Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Cajun Club, R&N Enterprises, Ltd. d/b/a Cajun Club, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Hilary Hepner, Jaime Longoria, Jessica Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Krystal Hipwell, Lina Posada, Lucy Pinder, Masha Lund, Rosie Wicks, Tara Leigh Patrick, Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Cajun Club and R&N Enterprises, Ltd. doing business as Cajun Club
Case Number: 3:2023cv00487
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff Illinois Casualty Company moves for an extension of time to file its response to defendants' joint motion to refer the complaint to arbitration and to stay proceedings, "joint motion." (Dkt. #16.) Defendants oppose the extension, asserting that it would prejudice them, as there is an impending trial date, September 26, 2023, in the underlying merits lawsuit. Under the current briefing schedule, the joint motion would not be fully briefed until September 11, 2023, and it is unlikely that the motion would be ruled upon before the September 26, 2023, trial date. Therefore, even assuming that the two actions were interrelated, there would be no prejudice to the defendants. Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED, and its response brief is now due September 21, 2023. Defendants' reply brief is now due October 2, 2023. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/1/2023. (lam)
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Refer Complaint to Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Illinois Casualty Company. Response due 9/7/2023. (Schwartz, Jonathan) Modified on 8/31/2023. (lak)
August 22, 2023 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant R&N Enterprises, Ltd.. R&N Enterprises, Ltd. waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
August 22, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc.. Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2023, answer due 10/20/2023. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
August 16, 2023 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Hilary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Masha Lund, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lina Posada. Brenda Geiger waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Cielo Jean Gibson waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Hilary Hepner waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Jessica Hinton waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Joanna Krupa waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Jaime Longoria waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Arianny Celeste Lopez waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Masha Lund waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Tara Leigh Patrick waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Lina Posada waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. (Schwartz, Jonathan) Modified on 8/16/2023. (lak)
August 16, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Krystal Hipwell, Lucy Pinder, Rosie Wicks. Krystal Hipwell waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Lucy Pinder waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023; Rosie Wicks waiver sent on 7/24/2023, answer due 9/22/2023. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
August 14, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant R&N Enterprises, Ltd.. (Lirot, Luke)
August 14, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc.. (Lirot, Luke)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Luke Lirot Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/11/2023. (lak)
August 10, 2023 Filing 8 Brief in Support of #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, to Refer Complaint to Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendants Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Hilary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Krystal Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Masha Lund, Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc., Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, R&N Enterprises, Ltd., Rosie Wicks (Attachments: #1 Mayer v Soik (unpublished opinion), #2 Jerneb v Partner Assessment Corp (unpublished opinion)) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 10, 2023 Filing 7 Defendants' Joint Motion to Refer Complaint to Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendants Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Hilary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Krystal Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Masha Lund, Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc., Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, R&N Enterprises, Ltd., Rosie Wicks. Response due 8/17/2023. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Luke Lirot Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3287618.) by Defendants Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc., R&N Enterprises, Ltd.. (Lirot, Luke)
August 10, 2023 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #7 Defendants' Joint Motion to Refer Complaint to Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Brief in Opposition due 8/31/2023. Brief in Reply due 9/11/2023. (rks)
August 7, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Edmund Samuel Aronowitz for Defendants Brenda Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Hilary Hepner, Jessica Hinton, Krystal Hipwell, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Masha Lund, Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Rosie Wicks. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
July 19, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
July 19, 2023 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related case 21cv657. (lak)
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Schwartz for Plaintiff Illinois Casualty Company. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Illinois Casualty Company. (Schwartz, Jonathan)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Illinois Casualty Company (Schwartz, Jonathan)
July 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3275808.), filed by Illinois Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018-2019 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2019-2020 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - 2020-2021 Policy, #4 Exhibit D - 2021-2022 Policy, #5 Exhibit E - First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand) (Schwartz, Jonathan) Modified on 7/19/2023: Correctly added Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. and R&N Enterprises, Ltd. E-mails sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Casualty Company v. Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Cajun Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&N Enterprises, Ltd. d/b/a Cajun Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arianny Celeste Lopez
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Hepner
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Longoria
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystal Hipwell
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Posada
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masha Lund
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie Wicks
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Edmund Samuel Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers' G.M. Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Cajun Club
Represented By: Luke Lirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&N Enterprises, Ltd. doing business as Cajun Club
Represented By: Luke Lirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?