Rougeau, Lucas et al v. Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lucas Rougeau, Alisha Rougeau, Carrie Brenton, Kerry Brenton, Timothy Gerdmann and Melissa Gerdmann
Defendant: 3M Company, Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC, Ahlstrom-Munksjo Specialty Solutions Acquisition LLC, Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co. and John Does 1-49
Case Number: 3:2023cv00546
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay This Action Pending Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/22/2023. (nln)
September 11, 2023 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY The Clerk of the MDL Panel has determined the listed action is not appropriate for inclusion in MDL No. 2873. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 8/14/2023. (arw)
September 6, 2023 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Derek John Waterstreet for Defendant 3M Company. (Waterstreet, Derek)
September 6, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Susan E Lovern for Defendant 3M Company. (Lovern, Susan)
September 1, 2023 Filing 21 Brief in Support of #20 Motion to Stay This Action Pending Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wisconsin Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - JPML December 2022 Order) (Ring, Daniel) Modified on 9/5/2023. (lak)
September 1, 2023 Filing 20 Motion to Stay This Action Pending Transfer Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant 3M Company. Response due 9/8/2023. (Ring, Daniel)
September 1, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant 3M Company. (Ring, Daniel)
September 1, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel L. Ring for Defendant 3M Company. (Ring, Daniel)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #15 Motion to Admit Michael D. Daneker Pro Hac Vice, granting #16 Motion to Admit Elissa J. Preheim Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/1/2023. (lak)
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 Motion to Admit Elissa J. Preheim Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3298918.) by Defendants Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC. (Preheim, Elissa)
August 31, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to Admit Michael D. Daneker Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3298895.) by Defendants Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC. (Daneker, Michael)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion to Admit Philip F. Cossich, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2023. (lak)
August 24, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to Admit Philip F. Cossich, Jr Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3295012.) by Plaintiff Lucas Rougeau. (Cossich, Philip)
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. 3M Company served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Land, Brett)
August 22, 2023 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Land, Brett)
August 22, 2023 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC served on 8/16/2023, answer due 9/6/2023. (Land, Brett)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Andrew Cvitanovic Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/21/2023. (lak)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Andrew John Cvitanovic Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3291923.) by Plaintiffs Carrie Brenton, Kerry Brenton, Melissa Gerdmann, Timothy Gerdmann, Alisha Rougeau, Lucas Rougeau. (Cvitanovic, Andrew)
August 18, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul E. Benson for Defendants Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC, Ahlstrom-Munksjo Specialty Solutions Acquisition LLC. (Benson, Paul)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Louis Olson for Defendants Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC, Ahlstrom-Munksjo Specialty Solutions Acquisition LLC. (Olson, Joseph)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Brett Land Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Admit Scott Summy Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/15/2023. (lak)
August 14, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Scott Summy Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3288968.) by Plaintiffs Carrie Brenton, Kerry Brenton, Melissa Gerdmann, Timothy Gerdmann, Alisha Rougeau, Lucas Rougeau. (Summy, Scott)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 Motion to Admit Brett Land Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3288815.) by Plaintiffs Carrie Brenton, Kerry Brenton, Melissa Gerdmann, Timothy Gerdmann, Alisha Rougeau, Lucas Rougeau. (Land, Brett)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued. (lak)
August 10, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 10, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3286724.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #2 Summons - 3M, #3 Summons - Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC, #4 Summons - Ahlstrom-Munksjo Specialty Solutions Acquisition, LLC, #5 Summons - Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC, #6 Summons - John Does 1-49) (Lonergan, Kristen) Modified on 8/10/2023: Corrected parties; deleted addresses; deleted duplicate text. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rougeau, Lucas et al v. Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahlstrom Rhinelander, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Paul E. Benson
Represented By: Elissa J. Preheim
Represented By: Michael D. Daneker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahlstrom-Munksjo Specialty Solutions Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Paul E. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahlstrom NA Specialty Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Paul E. Benson
Represented By: Joseph Louis Olson
Represented By: Elissa J. Preheim
Represented By: Michael D. Daneker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Represented By: Derek John Waterstreet
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Rougeau
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Philip F. Cossich, Jr
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisha Rougeau
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Brenton
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Brenton
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Scott Summy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Gerdmann
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Gerdmann
Represented By: Andrew John Cvitanovic
Represented By: Brett Land
Represented By: Scott Summy
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?