Perez, Luis et al v. Regal Rexnord Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Luis Perez and Jose Molla
Defendant: Regal Rexnord Corporation and Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00572
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Filing 17 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Lifshitz, Tal)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Regal Rexnord may have until November 6, 2023 to respond to the complaint. If it files a motion to dismiss, then briefing will proceed on a 30/14 response/reply cycle. The parties should not expect further extensions of these deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/14/2023. (nln)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. (Leffel, Michael)
September 13, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Regal Rexnord Corporation. (Leffel, Michael)
September 13, 2023 Filing 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Regal Rexnord Corporation, Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. (Leffel, Michael)
September 13, 2023 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Leffel for Defendants Regal Rexnord Corporation, Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. (Leffel, Michael)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Anne-Louise T. Mittal for Defendants Regal Rexnord Corporation, Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. (Mittal, Anne-Louise)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Brandon M. Sadowsky Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/7/2023. (lak)
September 6, 2023 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Regal Rexnord Corporation served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023. (Sadowsky, Brandon)
September 6, 2023 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Brandon Michael Sadowsky Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3301082.) by Plaintiffs Jose Molla, Luis Perez. (Sadowsky, Brandon)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion to Admit Benjamin J. Widlanski Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Admit Robert Neary Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/24/2023. (lak)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Robert Neary Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3294238.) by Plaintiffs Jose Molla, Luis Perez. (Neary, Robert)
August 23, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Benjamin Widlanski Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3294071.) by Plaintiffs Jose Molla, Luis Perez. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Tal J. Lifshitz Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/23/2023. (lak)
August 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Regal Rexnord Corporation and Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. (lak)
August 23, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 23, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to Admit Tal J Lifshitz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3293863.) by Plaintiffs Jose Molla, Luis Perez. (Lifshitz, Tal)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against Regal Rexnord Corporation, Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3293846.), filed by Jose Molla, Luis Perez. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Regal Rexnord Corporation, #3 Summons - Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC) (Lifshitz, Tal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez, Luis et al v. Regal Rexnord Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Perez
Represented By: Brandon Michael Sadowsky
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Robert Neary
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Molla
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Brandon Michael Sadowsky
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Represented By: Robert Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Rexnord Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Represented By: Anne-Louise T. Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Technology Power Systems ULC
Represented By: Michael D. Leffel
Represented By: Anne-Louise T. Mittal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?