Federal Trade Commission et al v. Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Wisconsin
Defendant: Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc. doing business as Rhinelander GM Auto Center doing business as Rhinelander Cadillac doing business as OK Used Cars of Rhinelander, Rhinelander Motor Company doing business as Rhinelander Toyota, Rhinelander Auto Group LLC doing business as Rhinelander GM Auto Center doing business as Rhinelander Cadillac doing business as OK Used Cars of Rhinelander, Rhinelander Import Group LLC doing business as Rhinelander Toyota and Daniel Towne
Case Number: 3:2023cv00737
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 18 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Trade Commission, State of Wisconsin against Rhinelander Auto Group LLC, Rhinelander Import Group LLC, Daniel Towne in the amount of $ 1,000,000.00. (WMC / rks). (rks/arw)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Federal Trade Commission, State of Wisconsin against Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc., Rhinelander Motor Company in the amount of $ 100,000.00. (WMC / rks). (rks/arw)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Initial Case Deadlines Pending Settlement Approval. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/1/2023. (jls)
October 31, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion to Approve Consent Judgment in Two Stipulated Orders by Plaintiffs Federal Trade Commission, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Stipulated Order with Rhinelander Auto Ctr. and Rhinelander Motor Co., #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Stipulated Order with Rhinelander Auto Grp., Rhinelander Import Grp., and Daniel Towne) (Nash, Nathan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Daniel Towne. Daniel Towne waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Nash, Nathan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rhinelander Import Group LLC. Rhinelander Import Group LLC waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Nash, Nathan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rhinelander Auto Group LLC. Rhinelander Auto Group LLC waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Nash, Nathan)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 Disregard, duplicate filing to dkt #10 . Modified on 10/31/2023 (jat).
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc.. Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc. waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Granetz, Rachel)
October 31, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Rhinelander Motor Company. Rhinelander Motor Company waiver sent on 10/30/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Granetz, Rachel)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Granetz for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Granetz, Rachel)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Ritchey Stroud for Plaintiff State of Wisconsin. (Stroud, Colin)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Initial Case Deadlines Pending Settlement Approval by Plaintiffs Federal Trade Commission, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Prior Owners Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Current Owners Settlement Agreement) (Nash, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel F Sifuentes for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Sifuentes, Rachel)
October 24, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Lewis W. Beilin for Plaintiff State of Wisconsin. (Beilin, Lewis)
October 24, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Nash for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Nash, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Nash, Nathan)
October 24, 2023 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
October 24, 2023 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Rachel F Sifuentes
Represented By: Nathan Nash
Represented By: Rachel Granetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Lewis W. Beilin
Represented By: Colin Ritchey Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhinelander Auto Center, Inc. doing business as Rhinelander GM Auto Center doing business as Rhinelander Cadillac doing business as OK Used Cars of Rhinelander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhinelander Motor Company doing business as Rhinelander Toyota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhinelander Auto Group LLC doing business as Rhinelander GM Auto Center doing business as Rhinelander Cadillac doing business as OK Used Cars of Rhinelander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhinelander Import Group LLC doing business as Rhinelander Toyota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Towne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?