Rayburn, John v. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Douglas Rayburn, II
Defendant: Apogee Enterprises, Inc., ABC Insurance Company, DEF Insurance Company, ABC Corporation, HIJ Insurance Company and Apogee Wausau Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00744
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Apogee Wausau Group, Inc.. (Windler, Joseph)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc.. (Windler, Joseph)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Action Request: The parties are reminded to file a joint report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (jls)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Telephone Pretrial: Telephone Pretrial Conference reset for 1/17/2024 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Exhibit to #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Apogee Enterprises, Inc. Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Windler, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc. re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Windler, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Brief in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc. (Windler, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 12/27/2023. Brief in Reply due 1/8/2024. (Windler, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **After defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc. filed a motion to dismiss, plaintiff filed an amended complaint, as it was entitled to do under Rule 15(a)(1)(B). So defendant's motions to dismiss, Dkt. #6 , is DENIED as moot. If defendant believes that the amended complaint is deficient, defendant will have to file a renewed motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/06/2023. (nln)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Apogee Wausau Group, Inc. served on 12/1/2023, answer due 12/22/2023. (Steffe, Christopher)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued/Reissued as to Apogee Enterprises, Inc. and Apogee Wausau Group, Inc. (lak)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Douglas Rayburn, II. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Apogee Enterprises, Inc., #2 Summons - Apogee Wausau Group, Inc.) (Steffe, Christopher) Modified on 11/22/2023: Deleted duplicate party Apogee Wausau Group, Inc. with address from database. (lak)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Exhibit to #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Apogee Enterprises, Inc. Proposed Order (Windler, Joseph)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc. (Windler, Joseph)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Declaration of Meghan M. Elliott filed by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc. re: #6 Motion to Dismiss (Windler, Joseph)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/22/2023. Brief in Reply due 12/4/2023. (Windler, Joseph)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff John Douglas Rayburn, II. (Steffe, Christopher) Modified on 10/30/2023: Not a motion. (lak)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Demand for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff John Douglas Rayburn, II (Steffe, Christopher)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Apogee Enterprises, Inc.. (Windler, Joseph)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Declaration of Joseph M Windler re #1 Notice of Removal, (Windler, Joseph)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marathon County Circuit Court, case number 2023CV000538. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3326633), filed by Apogee Enterprises, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Electronic Filing Notice, Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal and Attachments, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Winler, Joseph) Modified on 10/25/2023. (lak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayburn, John v. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Douglas Rayburn, II
Represented By: Christopher Steffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apogee Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIJ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apogee Wausau Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?