Jones, Craig v. Hanson, Christopher et al
Plaintiff: Craig Jones
Defendant: Christopher Hanson and Eric Diener
Case Number: 3:2023cv00782
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Flugaur for Defendants Eric Diener, Christopher Hanson. (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Eric Diener, Christopher Hanson. (Petering, Annie),(ps)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Annie Varkey Petering for Defendants Eric Diener, Christopher Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Petering, Annie),(ps)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/20/2023. (nln),(ps)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Craig Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Rejection Letters, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
December 7, 2023 Partial Filing fee received: $114.19, receipt number 2022. (nln),(ps)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Eric Diener, Christopher Hanson. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/20/2023. (nln),(ps)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 114.19 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 12/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 11/14/2023. (jef),(ps)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Craig Jones (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (voc),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2023: #3 IPP Calculation) (jef).
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Craig Jones. (jef),(ps)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Jones. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, Craig v. Hanson, Christopher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Hanson
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Represented By: Annie Varkey Petering
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Diener
Represented By: Annie Varkey Petering
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?