Knox, Lora et al v. American Family Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lora Knox, Jody Knox, Jeffrey Adams and Erin Adams
Defendant: American Family Insurance Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. and American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00790
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. American Family Insurance Company answer due 2/1/2024; American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co. answer due 2/1/2024; American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. answer due 2/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 01/10/2024. (acd)
January 10, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Yechiel M Twersky for Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (Twersky, Yechiel)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Marika Kaitlin O'Connor Grant for Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (O'Connor Grant, Marika)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Shanon Jude Carson for Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (Carson, Shanon)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co., American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Zylstra, Sarah)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. American Family Insurance Company answer due 1/22/2024; American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co. answer due 1/22/2024; American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. answer due 1/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/07/2023. (nln)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co., American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Zylstra, Sarah)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Anne Zylstra for Defendants American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co., American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Zylstra, Sarah)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Albanese, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co. served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Albanese, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. American Family Insurance Company served on 11/17/2023, answer due 12/8/2023. (Albanese, John)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Andrew R. Ochroch Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/22/2023. (lak)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Andrew Ochroch Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3339674.) by Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (Ochroch, Andrew)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Richard M. Ochroch Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Admit Brett N. Benton Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/21/2023. (lak)
November 20, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Brett N Benton Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3338927.) by Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (Benton, Brett)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 Motion to Admit Richard M Ochroch Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3338905.) by Plaintiffs Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox, Lora Knox. (Ochroch, Richard)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Defendants. (lak)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Family Insurance Company, American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co., American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AWIWDC-3336619.), filed by Lora Knox, Erin Adams, Jeffrey Adams, Jody Knox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Policy, #2 Exhibit B, Rental Reimbursement Coverage, #3 Exhibit C, American Family 4-18-23 Letter, #4 Exhibit D, L. Knox 4-20-23 Email, #5 Exhibit E, American Family Letter 2-9-23, #6 Exhibit F, American Family 2-16-23 Email, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons American Family Insurance Company, #9 Summons American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., #10 Summons American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co.) (Albanese, John)
November 15, 2023 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
November 15, 2023 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox, Lora et al v. American Family Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Knox
Represented By: John Albanese
Represented By: Marika Kaitlin O'Connor Grant
Represented By: Richard M Ochroch
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Yechiel M Twersky
Represented By: Andrew Ochroch
Represented By: Brett N Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Knox
Represented By: John Albanese
Represented By: Brett N Benton
Represented By: Marika Kaitlin O'Connor Grant
Represented By: Richard M Ochroch
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Yechiel M Twersky
Represented By: Andrew Ochroch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Adams
Represented By: John Albanese
Represented By: Andrew Ochroch
Represented By: Brett N Benton
Represented By: Marika Kaitlin O'Connor Grant
Represented By: Richard M Ochroch
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Yechiel M Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Adams
Represented By: John Albanese
Represented By: Andrew Ochroch
Represented By: Brett N Benton
Represented By: Marika Kaitlin O'Connor Grant
Represented By: Richard M Ochroch
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Yechiel M Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Company
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Mutual Holding, Co.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?